EP0551217 - Direct steel-making process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.1998 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIRGIN METALS (CANADA) LIMITED 95 Balmoral Avenue Toronto Ontario M4V 1J5 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1993/28] | For all designated states VIRGIN METALS (CANADA) LIMITED 95 Balmoral Avenue Toronto, Ontario M4V 1J5 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cavanagh, Patrick E. 95 Balmoral Avenue Toronto, Ontario, M4V 1J5 / CA | [1993/28] | Representative(s) | Silverman, Warren Haseltine Lake & Co. Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/28] | Silverman, Warren HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 93300159.6 | 11.01.1993 | [1993/28] | Priority number, date | GB19920000423 | 09.01.1992 Original published format: GB 9200423 | [1993/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0551217 | Date: | 14.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0551217 | Date: | 03.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C21B13/00 | [1993/28] | CPC: |
C21B13/0093 (EP,US);
C21B13/00 (KR);
Y02P10/134 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/28] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur direkten Gewinnung von Stahl | [1993/28] | English: | Direct steel-making process | [1993/28] | French: | Procédé de production directe d'acier | [1993/28] | Examination procedure | 11.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/11] | 25.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 26.05.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 03.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 03.12.1997 | [2000/05] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2287663 (BRASSERT HERMAN A); | [X]US2296498 (BRASSERT HERMAN A); | [X]GB980428 (RENAULT); | [A]GB1219674 (BRITISH IRON STEEL RESEARCH [GB]); | [X]GB2041413 (BRITISH STEEL CORP); | [A]EP0262353 (HYLSA SA [MX]) |