EP0552031 - Oxepane isomers of rapamycin useful as immunosuppressive agents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 13.11.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 12.05.2010 [2010/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wyeth Five Giralda Farms Madison, NJ 07940-0874 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/25] | For all designated states Wyeth Five Giralda Farms Madison, New Jersey 07940-0874 / US | ||
Former [1993/29] | For all designated states AMERICAN HOME PRODUCTS CORPORATION Five Giralda Farms Madison, New Jersey 07940-0874 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hughes, Philip Floyd 627 Arlington Street, Chapel Hill Orange County, North Carolina 27514 / US | [1993/29] | Representative(s) | Wileman, David Francis, et al C/o Wyeth Laboratories Huntercombe Lane South Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 OPH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/29] | Wileman, David Francis, Dr., et al c/o Wyeth Laboratories Huntercombe Lane South Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 OPH / GB | Application number, filing date | 93300207.3 | 14.01.1993 | [1993/29] | Priority number, date | US19920822171 | 16.01.1992 Original published format: US 822171 | [1993/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0552031 | Date: | 21.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0552031 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07D498/18, A61K31/435, // (C07D498/18, 313:00, 273:00, 273:00) | [1993/29] | CPC: |
C07D471/18 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1993/29] | Title | German: | Oxepan-Isomere von Rapamycin brauchbar als immunosuppressive Wirkstoffe | [1993/29] | English: | Oxepane isomers of rapamycin useful as immunosuppressive agents | [1993/29] | French: | Isomères oxépaniques de rapamycine utiles comme agents immunosuppresseurs | [1993/29] | Examination procedure | 23.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/03] | 07.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 23.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.03.2003
ADMISSIBLE ABBOTT LABORATORIES 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park IL 60064 / US Opponent's representative Wright, Robert Gordon McRae Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.03.2003
ADMISSIBLE Abbott Laboratories 100 Abbott Park Road, Abbott Park Illinois 60064-6050 / US Opponent's representative Wright, Robert Gordon McRae Elkington & Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | 22.04.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.01.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.02.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.05.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 16.10.2009 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2009/51] | Appeal following opposition | 02.07.2007 | Appeal received No. T1103/07 | 12.09.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 16.10.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Request for further processing for: | 10.03.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 10.03.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.03.2000 | Decision despatched | 23.04.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 23.04.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 11.05.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 12.06.2002 | LI | 12.06.2002 | AT | 14.01.2008 | BE | 31.01.2008 | PT | 14.07.2008 | GR | 04.08.2008 | [2010/19] |
Former [2009/30] | AT | 14.01.2008 | |
BE | 31.01.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
GR | 04.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 14.01.2008 | |
BE | 31.01.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 14.01.2008 | |
PT | 14.07.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | GB2246350 [ ] (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]); | [ ] - D. ASKIN ET AL., "Chemistry of FK-506: Benzilic acid rearrangement of the tricarbonyl system", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1989), vol. 30, no. 6, pages 671 - 674, XP003012927 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(01)80278-1 | [ ] - HUGHES P. ET AL., "The isolation, synthesis and characterization of an isomeric form of rapamycin", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1992), vol. 33, no. 33, pages 4739 - 4742, XP002436593 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)61273-X |