EP0553968 - Apparatus and method for measuring the tightness of stator wedges in the stator without removing the rotor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.01.1996 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.02.1996 | Renewal fee | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building, Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/31] | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fischer, Mark William 309 Bryant Drive Pittsburgh, PA 15235-4631 / US | 02 /
Alford, James Warren 1518 Luray Drive Pittsburgh, PA 15239 / US | 03 /
Dailey, George Franklin 536 Surfside Drive Pittsburgh, PA 15239 / US | 04 /
Noll, John Edward, Jr. 1717 Romine Avenue Port Vue, PA 15133 / US | [1993/31] | Representative(s) | Van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 30 The Green Calne Wiltshire SN11 8DJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/31] | van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 23, Centre Heights London NW3 6JG / GB | Application number, filing date | 93300209.9 | 14.01.1993 | [1993/31] | Priority number, date | US19920828099 | 30.01.1992 Original published format: US 828099 | [1993/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0553968 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0553968 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01M7/02, G01M7/08 | [1994/42] | CPC: |
G01M7/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/31] | G01M7/02 | Designated contracting states | BE, ES, FR, GB [1993/31] | Title | German: | Apparat und Verfahren zur Messung der Dichtigkeit der Statorkeile im Stator ohne Rotorentfernung | [1993/31] | English: | Apparatus and method for measuring the tightness of stator wedges in the stator without removing the rotor | [1993/31] | French: | Appareil et méthode pour mesurer l'étanchéité des coins de stator dans le stator sans enlever le rotor | [1993/31] | Examination procedure | 02.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/27] | 01.08.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/05] | 31.08.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1996/05] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1995 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU1640661 ; | [AD]US4889000 (JAAFAR HAMEDO A [US], et al) [AD] 1-4* claims 1-9 *; | [A]US4901572 (SUYAMA TOSHIMITSU [JP]) [A] 1-4 * claims 1-36 *; | [AD]US4962660 (DAILEY GEORGE F [US], et al) [AD] 1-4 * claims 1-13 *; | [A]EP0415042 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [A] 2-4 * claims 1-22 *; | [A]US5012684 (HUMPHRIES BENJAMIN T [US]) [A] 1-4 * column 3 - column 5 * | [A] - SOVIET PATENTS ABSTRACTS, 6, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 91, no. 49, Database accession no. 91-360548, & SU1640661 A 19910407 (ELECTROMECH RES.) [A] 1 * abstract * |