EP0552977 - Aromatic thioether ketone/thioether sulfone copolymer and production process thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.1997 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.09.1997 [1997/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KUREHA KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-9-11, Nihonbashi, Horidome-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8552 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/30] | For all designated states KUREHA KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-9-11, Nihonbashi, Horidome-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawakami, Yukichika 25-13, Negoya, Ueda-machi Iwaki-shi, Fukushima-ken 974 / JP | 02 /
Shiiki, Zenya 28-1, Ochiai, Nishiki-machi Iwaki-shi, Fukushima-ken 974 / JP | [1993/30] | Representative(s) | Jones, Helen M.M. Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/30] | Jones, Helen Marjorie Meredith Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 93300473.1 | 22.01.1993 | [1993/30] | Priority number, date | JP19920034251 | 23.01.1992 Original published format: JP 3425192 | JP19920101692 | 26.03.1992 Original published format: JP 10169292 | JP19920307908 | 23.10.1992 Original published format: JP 30790892 | [1993/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0552977 | Date: | 28.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0552977 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08G75/02 | [1993/30] | CPC: |
C08G75/0254 (EP,US);
C08G75/0236 (EP,US);
D01F6/76 (EP,US);
Y10S525/906 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/30] | Title | German: | Aromatisches Thioetherketon/Thioethersulphon-Copolymer und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1993/30] | English: | Aromatic thioether ketone/thioether sulfone copolymer and production process thereof | [1993/30] | French: | Copolymère aromatique de thioéthercétone/thioéthersulphone et procédé pour sa production | [1993/30] | Examination procedure | 12.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/30] | 06.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/38] | 16.04.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1997 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]DE4206996 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS [JP]); | [A]EP0210377 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]); | [A]EP0459620 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]) |