EP0557025 - High performance channels for data processing systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2002 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/03] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | ||
Former [1997/06] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | ||
Former [1993/34] | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bartow, Niel George 6497 Beaver Drive Saugerties, NY 12477 / US | 02 /
Brown, Paul Joseph 16 Carmen Drive Poughkeepsie, NY 12603 / US | 03 /
Capowski, Robert Stanley RD No.2, Box 49 Verbank, NY 12585 / US | 04 /
Fasano, Louis Thomas 89 Spring Street Poughkeepsie, NY 12601 / US | 05 /
Cregg, Thomas Anthony 121 Bellevue Road Highland, NY 12528 / US | 06 /
Salyer, Gregory 8 Sawood Lane Woodstock, NY 12498 / US | 07 /
Westcott, Douglas Wayne 84 Ackert Hook Road Rhinebeck, NY 12572 / US | [1993/34] | Representative(s) | Burt, Roger James IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/40] | Burt, Roger James, Dr. IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1993/34] | Killgren, Neil Arthur IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 93301037.3 | 12.02.1993 | [1993/34] | Priority number, date | US19920839652 | 20.02.1992 Original published format: US 839652 | [1993/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0557025 | Date: | 25.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0557025 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/12 | [1993/34] | CPC: |
G06F13/122 (EP,US);
H04L69/40 (EP,US);
H04L69/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/34] | Title | German: | Hochleistungskanäle für Datenverarbeitungssysteme | [1993/34] | English: | High performance channels for data processing systems | [1993/34] | French: | Canaux à haute performance pour des systèmes de traitement de données | [1993/34] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/08] | 18.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.01.2002 | CH | 16.01.2002 | IT | 16.01.2002 | LI | 16.01.2002 | NL | 16.01.2002 | [2008/05] |
Former [2003/09] | AT | 16.01.2002 | |
CH | 16.01.2002 | ||
LI | 16.01.2002 | ||
NL | 16.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/08] | CH | 16.01.2002 | |
LI | 16.01.2002 | ||
NL | 16.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 16.01.2002 | |
LI | 16.01.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0029331 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [X]WO8404831 (RAMTEK CORP [US]) |