EP0558218 - Fastener for releasably fastening face guard to helmet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.1996 [1996/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YKK Corporation No. 1, Kanda Izumi-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/49] | For all designated states YKK CORPORATION No. 1, Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1993/35] | For all designated states YOSHIDA KOGYO K.K. No. 1 Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matoba, Hiroshi 1262, Hikatae Toyama-shi, Toyama-ken / JP | [1993/35] | Representative(s) | White, Martin David, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/35] | White, Martin David, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57/60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 93301086.0 | 16.02.1993 | [1993/35] | Priority number, date | JP19920009320 | 27.02.1992 Original published format: JP 932092 | [1993/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0558218 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0558218 | Date: | 25.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A42B3/32, A44B1/32 | [1993/35] | CPC: |
A42B3/326 (EP,US);
A44B1/32 (EP,US);
Y10S24/60 (US);
Y10T24/4522 (EP,US);
Y10T24/45995 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/35] | Title | German: | Verschluss zum lösbaren Befestigen eines Gesichtsschutzes an einem Helm | [1993/35] | English: | Fastener for releasably fastening face guard to helmet | [1993/35] | French: | Attache pour fixer de manière amovible un dispositif protecteur du visage sur un casque | [1993/35] | Examination procedure | 25.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/04] | 11.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU1329759 ; | [A]DE89002 ; | [A]DE213415 ; | [A]DE33397 ; | [A]CH103033 (PISCHEK FRITZ [CH]); | [A]EP0348841 (YOSHIDA KOGYO KK [JP]); | [AD]EP0368360 (YOSHIDA KOGYO KK [JP], et al) | [A] - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED Section PQ, Week 8811, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class P21, AN 88-076441 & SU-A-1 329 759 (SALBO PLASTICS WKS), & SU1329759 A 00000000 |