EP0557052 - Analog to digital converter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.1995 | Request for examination filed | published on 26.04.1995 [1995/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/34] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jewett, Robert E. 962 Stony Hill Road Redwood City, California 94061 / US | [1993/41] |
Former [1993/34] | 01 /
Jewett, Robert E. 535 Everett Avenue No.103 Palo Alto, California 94301 / US | Representative(s) | Williams, John Francis, et al WILLIAMS, POWELL & ASSOCIATES 4 St Paul's Churchyard London EC4M 8AY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/34] | Williams, John Francis, et al WILLIAMS, POWELL & ASSOCIATES 34 Tavistock Street London WC2E 7PB / GB | Application number, filing date | 93301108.2 | 16.02.1993 | [1993/34] | Priority number, date | US19920839536 | 19.02.1992 Original published format: US 839536 | [1993/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0557052 | Date: | 25.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0557052 | Date: | 26.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H03M1/34 | [1993/34] | CPC: |
H03M1/0682 (EP);
H03M1/167 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/34] | Title | German: | Analog-/Digitalwandler | [1993/34] | English: | Analog to digital converter | [1993/34] | French: | Convertisseur analogique-numérique | [1993/34] | File destroyed: | 04.09.2001 | Examination procedure | 28.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/17] | 01.03.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS5723322 ; | [A]GB2223137 (THE GENERAL ELECTRIC) [A] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0442321 (SIEMENS) [A] 1-4 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820525), vol. 6, no. 87, Database accession no. (E - 108)<965> , & JP57023322 A 19820206 (TAKEDA RIJEN KOGYO) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [X] - SHIVASHANKAR ET AL, "pipeline analogue to ternary converter", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ELECTRONICS, BASINGSTOKE, HAMPSHIRE, GB, (198210), vol. 53, no. 4, pages 357 - 361 [X] 1 * page 358, paragraph 3 - page 359; figures 3,4 * |