EP0562717 - A liquid container, an ink jet cartridge comprising a liquid container and an ink jet recording apparatus having such a cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/39] | Valve mechanism for a liquid container in a liquid recording apparatus | ||
[1998/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 11.02.2004 [2004/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/39] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ujita, Toshihiko, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Nakajima, Kazuhiro, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Sato, Yohei, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Murakami, Shuichi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1993/39] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/39] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93301273.4 | 22.02.1993 | [1993/39] | Priority number, date | JP19920036263 | 24.02.1992 Original published format: JP 3626392 | JP19920054901 | 13.03.1992 Original published format: JP 5490192 | JP19920145585 | 05.06.1992 Original published format: JP 14558592 | JP19920173258 | 30.06.1992 Original published format: JP 17325892 | JP19920173236 | 30.06.1992 Original published format: JP 17323692 | [1993/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0562717 | Date: | 29.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0562717 | Date: | 21.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175 | [1993/39] | CPC: |
B41J2/17596 (EP,US);
F16K1/30 (KR);
F16K15/161 (US);
Y10T137/7772 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1993/39] | Title | German: | Ein Flüssigkeitsbehälter, eine Tintenstrahlpatrone mit einem Flüssigkeitsbehälter und ein Tintenstrahl- Aufzeichnungsgerät mit derartiger Patrone | [1998/37] | English: | A liquid container, an ink jet cartridge comprising a liquid container and an ink jet recording apparatus having such a cartridge | [1998/38] | French: | Un récipient de liquide, une cartouche à jet d'encre comprenant un récipient de liquide et un appareil d'enregistrement à jet d'encre ayant ladite cartouche | [1999/04] |
Former [1993/39] | Ventilmechanismus für Flüssigkeitsbehälter in einer Flüssigkeitsaufzeichnungsvorrichtung | ||
Former [1993/39] | Valve mechanism for a liquid container in a liquid recording apparatus | ||
Former [1993/39] | Mécanisme de soupape pour conteneur de liquide dans un appareil d'enregistrement à liquide | Examination procedure | 23.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/16] | 30.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 26.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/15] | Request for further processing for: | 25.04.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 25.04.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.07.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.04.1999 | BE | 21.04.1999 | CH | 21.04.1999 | ES | 21.04.1999 | GR | 21.04.1999 | LI | 21.04.1999 | NL | 21.04.1999 | SE | 21.04.1999 | DK | 21.07.1999 | PT | 21.07.1999 | [2004/07] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 21.04.1999 | |
BE | 21.04.1999 | ||
CH | 21.04.1999 | ||
ES | 21.04.1999 | ||
LI | 21.04.1999 | ||
NL | 21.04.1999 | ||
SE | 21.04.1999 | ||
DK | 21.07.1999 | ||
PT | 21.07.1999 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 21.04.1999 | |
BE | 21.04.1999 | ||
CH | 21.04.1999 | ||
ES | 21.04.1999 | ||
LI | 21.04.1999 | ||
NL | 21.04.1999 | ||
SE | 21.04.1999 | ||
PT | 21.07.1999 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 21.04.1999 | |
BE | 21.04.1999 | ||
CH | 21.04.1999 | ||
ES | 21.04.1999 | ||
LI | 21.04.1999 | ||
SE | 21.04.1999 | ||
PT | 21.07.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 21.04.1999 | |
BE | 21.04.1999 | ||
CH | 21.04.1999 | ||
LI | 21.04.1999 | ||
SE | 21.04.1999 | ||
PT | 21.07.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 21.04.1999 | |
BE | 21.04.1999 | ||
CH | 21.04.1999 | ||
LI | 21.04.1999 | ||
PT | 21.07.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 21.04.1999 | |
BE | 21.04.1999 | ||
PT | 21.07.1999 | ||
CH | 26.07.1999 | ||
LI | 26.07.1999 | ||
Former [2000/25] | AT | 21.04.1999 | |
BE | 21.04.1999 | ||
PT | 21.07.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | AT | 21.04.1999 | |
BE | 21.04.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | BE | 21.04.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0052914 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [X]US5040002 (POLLACEK JAMES E [US], et al); | [X]EP0463849 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) |