EP0579351 - Thermal-transfer recording sheet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.1997 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.10.1997 [1997/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 6-7, Minamihommachi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/03] | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 6-7, Minamihommachi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Noguchi, Michiko 1994-384, Hazama-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ishikawa, Toshifumi 6-16-25, Seishin Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Yamagishi, Takashi 4-4-21, Utsukushigaoka, Midori-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1994/03] | Representative(s) | Votier, Sidney David, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [1994/03] | Application number, filing date | 93301540.6 | 01.03.1993 | [1994/03] | Priority number, date | JP19920159463 | 18.06.1992 Original published format: JP 15946392 | [1994/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0579351 | Date: | 19.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0579351 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/00 | [1994/03] | CPC: |
B41M5/5227 (EP,US);
B41M5/00 (KR);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
Y10S428/914 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24893 (EP,US);
Y10T428/254 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31786 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/03] | Title | German: | Aufnahmeträger für thermische Farbstoffübertragung | [1994/03] | English: | Thermal-transfer recording sheet | [1994/03] | French: | Support d'enregistrement pour transfert thermique | [1994/03] | Examination procedure | 19.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/29] | 08.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 26.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 01.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4965239 (HENZEL RICHARD P [US]) [A] 1-17 * claims 1-20 *; | [A]US4965238 (HENZEL RICHARD P [US]) [A] 1-17 * claims 1-20 *; | [A]EP0370441 (KANZAKI PAPER MFG CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * claims 1-3 * |