EP0559480 - Motor drive having invertor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.12.1996 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.1996 | Refusal of application | published on 05.02.1997 [1997/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1, Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/36] | For all designated states BROTHER KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 15-1, Naeshiro-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mori, Shushin, c/o Brother Kogyo K.K. No. 15-1 Naeshiro-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [1993/36] | Representative(s) | Senior, Alan Murray J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/36] | Senior, Alan Murray J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 93301671.9 | 05.03.1993 | [1993/36] | Priority number, date | JP19920049350 | 06.03.1992 Original published format: JP 4935092 | [1993/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0559480 | Date: | 08.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0559480 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H02P5/40, H02M7/5387 | [1994/14] | CPC: |
H02P6/24 (EP,US);
H02M7/00 (KR);
H02P3/18 (EP,US);
H02P6/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/36] | H02P5/40 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1993/36] | Title | German: | Motorantrieb mit Inverter | [1993/36] | English: | Motor drive having invertor | [1993/36] | French: | Entraînement du moteur avec onduleur | [1993/36] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 04.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/39] | 14.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.09.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1997/06] | 20.09.1996 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1997/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0426495 ; | [A]EP0069469 (FANUC LTD [JP]) [A] 4,5* page 23, line 30 - page 24, line 7; figure 17 *; | [A]DE3438034 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920508), vol. 16, no. 190, Database accession no. (C - 937), & JP04026495 A 19920129 (BROTHER IND LTD) [A] 1,3,7,10,13 * abstract * |