EP0564102 - Wide inkjet printhead [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.11.1997 [1997/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/40] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Allen, Ross R. 408 Hainline Drive Belmont, California 94002 / US | 02 /
Lam, Si-Ty 3861 Kamp Drive Pleasanton, California 94588 / US | 03 /
McLelland, Paul H. 20225 Kerber Road Monmouth, Oregon 97361 / US | [1993/40] | Representative(s) | Williams, John Francis, et al WILLIAMS, POWELL & ASSOCIATES 4 St Paul's Churchyard London EC4M 8AY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/40] | Williams, John Francis, et al WILLIAMS, POWELL & ASSOCIATES 34 Tavistock Street London WC2E 7PB / GB | Application number, filing date | 93301708.9 | 08.03.1993 | [1993/40] | Priority number, date | US19920864890 | 02.04.1992 Original published format: US 864890 | [1993/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0564102 | Date: | 06.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0564102 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0564102 | Date: | 27.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/16, B41J2/155, B41J2/14 | [1994/37] | CPC: |
B41J2/1634 (EP,US);
B41J2/16 (KR);
B41J2/14024 (EP,US);
B41J2/14072 (EP,US);
B41J2/155 (EP,US);
B41J2/162 (EP,US);
B41J2/1623 (EP,US);
B41J2/1626 (EP,US);
B41J2/1631 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1993/40] | B41J2/16, B41J2/155 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1993/40] | Title | German: | Grossbereich-Tintenstrahldruckkopf | [1993/40] | English: | Wide inkjet printhead | [1993/40] | French: | Tête d'impression à jet d'encre à grande portée | [1993/40] | Examination procedure | 29.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/30] | 19.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4558333 (SUGITANI HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 3-5; | [A]EP0471157 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1,3-5 * column 3, line 53 - column 5, line 52; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0367541 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,3-5 * page 18, line 34 - line 43; figure 36 * * page 20, line 54 - page 21, line 5; figure 40 *; | [A]JPH03277554 ; | [A]EP0309146 (AM INT [US]); | [A]EP0454152 (CANON KK [JP]); | [A]EP0440263 (CANON KK [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920313), vol. 16, no. 103, Database accession no. (M - 1221), & JP03277554 A 19911209 (SEIKO) [A] 1,3-5 * abstract * |