EP0562803 - Speed change control apparatus and method for an automotive automatic transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.07.1998 [1998/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Jidosha Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 33-8, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/39] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JIDOSHA KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 33-8, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kenjiro, Fujita 1919-16, Nojicho Kutatsu-shi, Shiga / JP | 02 /
Katsutoshi, Usuki, Mitsubishi Dai-4, Seimei-ryo 18, Katsuragoshocho, Nishikyo Kyoto-shi, Kyoto / JP | [1993/39] | Representative(s) | Blanco White, Henry Nicholas, et al ABEL & IMRAY 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/39] | Blanco White, Henry Nicholas, et al ABEL & IMRAY Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 93302172.7 | 22.03.1993 | [1993/39] | Priority number, date | JP19920065916 | 24.03.1992 Original published format: JP 6591692 | [1993/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0562803 | Date: | 29.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0562803 | Date: | 23.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0562803 | Date: | 23.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/02, F16H59/72, F16H61/06 | [1994/48] | CPC: |
F16H59/72 (EP,KR,US);
F16H61/0213 (EP,KR,US);
F16H59/78 (EP,KR,US);
F16H2061/0096 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/39] | F16H59/72, F16H61/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Gangschaltsteuerung eines Fahrzeug-Automatikgetriebes | [1993/39] | English: | Speed change control apparatus and method for an automotive automatic transmission | [1993/39] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de commande de changement de vitesse pour une transmission automatique d'automobile | [1993/39] | Examination procedure | 28.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/26] | 02.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5069084 (MATSUNO YUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,4,5; | [A]US5072630 (KIKUCHI TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,4,5 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN [A] 1,2,4,5 | Examination | US4531432 |