EP0564164 - Telecommunications instrument with capacitive controller [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/40] | Capacitive proximity sensors | ||
[1997/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.1998 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.05.1998 [1998/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1994/40] |
Former [1993/40] | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boie, Robert Albert 200 Linden Ave Westfield, New Jersey 07090 / US | 02 /
Miller, Gabriel Lorimer 614 Boulevard Westfield, New Jersey 07090 / US | [1993/40] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al AT&T (UK) LTD., AT&T Intellectual Property Division, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | ||
Former [1993/40] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk AT&T (UK) LTD. 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 93302278.2 | 25.03.1993 | [1993/40] | Priority number, date | US19920861667 | 01.04.1992 Original published format: US 861667 | [1993/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0564164 | Date: | 06.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0564164 | Date: | 28.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/24, H03K17/955, G06K7/10, H04M1/60 | [1993/40] | CPC: |
G01D5/2405 (EP,US);
G01R13/00 (KR);
H03K17/955 (EP,US);
H04M1/19 (EP,US);
H04M1/6033 (EP,US);
H04M1/605 (EP,US);
H03K2017/9613 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1993/40] | Title | German: | Telekommunikations-Gerät mit kapazitiver Steuereinrichtung | [1997/22] | English: | Telecommunications instrument with capacitive controller | [1997/22] | French: | Dispositif de télécommunication avec controlleur capacitif | [1997/22] |
Former [1993/40] | Kapazitive Annäherungssensoren | ||
Former [1993/40] | Capacitive proximity sensors | ||
Former [1993/40] | Capteurs de proximité capacitives | Examination procedure | 24.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/21] | 23.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3401883 (SCHIEF ALFRED); | [A]US4743773 (KATANA YUKIO [JP], et al); | [YD]US4893071 (MILLER GABRIEL L [US]); | [Y]WO9014604 (MOONSTONE DESIGNS LTD [GB]); | [X]DE4006119 (INES GMBH [DE]) |