EP0619200 - Stepped compound voltage control circuit of battery in combination with field-control DC motor driving circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.07.1998 [1998/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yang, Tai-Her 5-1 Taipin Street Si-Hu Town Dzan-Hwa / TW | [N/P] |
Former [1994/41] | For all designated states Yang, Tai-Her 5-1 Taipin Street Si-Hu Town Dzan-Hwa / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/41] | Representative(s) | Arthur, Bryan Edward Withers & Rogers Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/41] | Arthur, Bryan Edward Withers & Rogers 4 Dyers Buildings Holborn London, EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 93302431.7 | 29.03.1993 | [1994/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0619200 | Date: | 12.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0619200 | Date: | 09.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B60L11/18 | [1994/41] | CPC: |
H02M7/483 (EP,US);
H02M7/49 (EP);
H02P7/0094 (EP,US);
H02P7/14 (EP,US);
H02P7/28 (EP,US);
Y02E10/56 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/41] | Title | German: | Gestaffelte und gekoppelte Batterienspannungsregelung kombiniert mit einer gleichstrommotorregelung mit Feldregelung | [1994/41] | English: | Stepped compound voltage control circuit of battery in combination with field-control DC motor driving circuit | [1994/41] | French: | Circuit de commande de tension composée et étagée de batteries en combinaison avec un circuit de commande de moteur à courant continu à contrôle de flux | [1994/41] | Examination procedure | 11.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/24] | 15.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1996 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 09.07.1997 | [1998/21] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2437103 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]); | [A]GB1590375 (CHLORIDE GROUP LTD); | [Y]EP0456345 (RAYMOND CORP [US]) |