EP0565290 - Object tracking system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2000 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/41] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brigida, David Joseph 2820 NW 44th Street Boca Raton, Florida 33434 / US | 02 /
Brown, Marvin Kenneth 1099 SW 16th Street Boca Raton, Florida 33486 / US | 03 /
Fado, Francis 1105 Bel Air Drive Highland Beach, Florida 33487 / US | 04 /
Moore, Victor Stuart 5122 Cortez Court Delray Beach, Florida 33483 / US | 05 /
Pate, Thomas Kent 22734 Pinewood Court Boca Raton, Florida 33433 / US | 06 /
Tout, James John 18445 Tapadero Terrace Boca Raton, Florida33496 / US | [1993/41] | Representative(s) | Burt, Roger James IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/41] | Burt, Roger James, Dr. IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 93302442.4 | 29.03.1993 | [1993/41] | Priority number, date | US19920863988 | 06.04.1992 Original published format: US 863988 | [1993/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0565290 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0565290 | Date: | 04.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0565290 | Date: | 16.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G06K17/00 | [1993/41] | CPC: |
G07B17/00661 (EP,US);
G06F3/0488 (EP,US);
G06K17/00 (EP,US);
G06Q10/08 (EP,US);
G07B17/0008 (EP,US);
G07B17/00193 (EP,US);
G07B17/00362 (EP,US);
G07B17/00508 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00096 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00112 (EP,US);
G07B2017/0012 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00217 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00282 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00379 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00588 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00717 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/41] | Title | German: | Objektverfolgungsystem | [1993/41] | English: | Object tracking system | [1993/41] | French: | Système de suivi d'un objet | [1993/41] | Examination procedure | 27.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/09] | 18.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP98306672.1 / EP0911754 | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.06.1993 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   22.06.1993 | 22.06.1993 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   22.06.1993 | 22.06.1993 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   22.06.1993 | 22.06.1993 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   22.06.1993 | 22.06.1993 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   22.06.1993 | 22.06.1993 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   22.06.1993 | 22.06.1993 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   22.06.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 16.06.1999 | [2002/26] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2526184 (MICHEL GEORGES [FR]); | [A]EP0137966 (OPTEL SYSTEMS INC [US]); | [A]FR2561949 (ARC SERVICES [FR]); | [Y]GB2212310 (STEP BY STEP CONSULTANTS LIMIT [GB]); | [Y]EP0354814 (ESSELTE METO INT GMBH [DE]) |