EP0565319 - Power saving control system for computer system with feature of selective initiation of power saving control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.1995 [1995/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIA SEMICON SYSTEMS INCORPORATED 37-8, Sangenjaya 1-Chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/41] | For all designated states DIA SEMICON SYSTEMS INCORPORATED 37-8, Sangenjaya 1-Chome Setagaya-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ikeda, Osamu 14-3, Higashisuna 6-chome Kouto-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1993/41] | Representative(s) | Charlton, Peter John Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/41] | Charlton, Peter John Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 93302622.1 | 02.04.1993 | [1993/41] | Priority number, date | JP19920080806 | 02.04.1992 Original published format: JP 8080692 | [1993/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0565319 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/32 | [1993/41] | CPC: |
G06F1/3215 (EP,US);
G06F1/324 (EP,US);
Y02D10/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1993/41] | Title | German: | Leistungssparsteuerungssystem für Rechnersystem mit auswählendem Beginn der Leistungssparsteuerungssystems | [1993/41] | English: | Power saving control system for computer system with feature of selective initiation of power saving control | [1993/41] | French: | Système de commande d'économie d'alimentation pour système d'ordinateur avec initialisation sélective de commande d'économie d'alimentation | [1993/41] | File destroyed: | 04.09.2001 | Examination procedure | 26.08.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1995/04] | 14.10.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/04] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9100566 (POQET COMPUTER CORP [US]); | [A]EP0419908 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | [A]EP0456012 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [A]JPS60150137 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9no. 323 (P-414)18 December 1985 & JP-A-60 150 137 ( MATSUSHITA DENKO KK ) 7 August 1985 |