EP0566311 - Siloxane fluids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.1995 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.08.1995 [1995/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/42] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stank, Robert Gerard 92 Pepperbush Place Ballston Spa, New York 12020 / US | 02 /
Tolentino, Luisito Alvarez 4 Cherry Hills Court Clifton Park, New York 12065 / US | 03 /
Ritzer, Alan Box 253 Laetanna Hillsite Sand Lake, New York 12153 / US | 04 /
Traver, Frank John 1 Downey Road Troy, New York 12180 / US | [1993/42] | Representative(s) | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/42] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 93302755.9 | 07.04.1993 | [1993/42] | Priority number, date | US19920867938 | 13.04.1992 Original published format: US 867938 | [1993/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0566311 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0566311 | Date: | 10.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/50, C08G77/48 | [1993/45] | CPC: |
C08G77/50 (EP,KR,US);
C08G77/06 (KR);
C08G77/48 (EP,US);
Y10S516/01 (EP,US);
Y10S516/07 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/42] | C08G77/50 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/42] | Title | German: | Flüssige Polysiloxane | [1993/42] | English: | Siloxane fluids | [1993/42] | French: | Fluides polysiloxanes | [1993/42] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 28.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/25] | 28.06.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0178191 (RHONE POULENC SPEC CHIM [FR]); | [X]US4221691 (DANIELSON JACK B, et al); | [X]FR1446520 (MIDLAND SILICONES LTD); | [X]GB736971 (RHONE POULENC SA); | [X]US2575141 (ROBERT SMITH-JOHANNSEN); | [A]EP0089783 (DOW CORNING [US]) |