EP0573154 - Magnetoresistive transducers and method of production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.1997 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.1997 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.07.1997 [1997/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anthony, Thomas C. 1161 Pimento Avenue Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US | 02 /
Brug, James A. 205 Marmons Drive Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | [1993/49] | Representative(s) | Powell, Stephen David, et al Williams Powell 44 Prospect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | Powell, Stephen David, et al WILLIAMS, POWELL & ASSOCIATES 34 Tavistock Street London WC2E 7PB / GB | Application number, filing date | 93303660.0 | 12.05.1993 | [1993/49] | Priority number, date | US19920894389 | 05.06.1992 Original published format: US 894389 | [1993/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0573154 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0573154 | Date: | 31.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/39 | [1993/49] | CPC: |
G11B5/3906 (EP,US);
G11B5/3954 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/49] | Title | German: | Magnetoresistive Wandler und Herstellungsverfahren | [1993/49] | English: | Magnetoresistive transducers and method of production | [1993/49] | French: | Transducteurs magnétorésistifs et procédé de fabrication | [1993/49] | Examination procedure | 19.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/12] | 24.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.1997 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1997/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH04143914 ; | [Y]US4987509 (GILL HARDAYAL S [US], et al) [Y] 2,8 * column 3, line 6 - line 42; figures 1A,B *; | [A]US5079831 (REID JAMES [US]) [A] 2 * abstract *; | [A]JPS61267914 ; | [PX]JPH04188418 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920907), vol. 16, no. 424, Database accession no. (P - 1415), & JP04143914 A 19920518 (NEC CORP.) [X] 1,5-7 * abstract * [Y] 2,8 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870416), vol. 11, no. 121, Database accession no. (P - 568), & JP61267914 A 19861127 (NEC CORP.) [A] 4 * abstract * | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921022), vol. 16, no. 514, Database accession no. (P - 1442), & JP04188418 A 19920707 (HITACHI LTD.) [PX] 1,7 * abstract * |