EP0571137 - Fluid pressure control device for an automatic transmission in a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.12.1997 [1997/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Jidosha Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 33-8, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JIDOSHA ENGINEERING KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Nakashinkiri, Hashime-cho Okazaki-shi Aichi 444-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/47] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JIDOSHA KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 33-8, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | ||
For all designated states MITSUBISHI JIDOSHA ENGINEERING KABUSHIKI KAISHA 21-1, Shimomaruko, 4-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujita, Kenjiro 1919-16, Nojicho Kusatsu-shi, Shiga / JP | 02 /
Kondo, Akihiro Mitsubishi Shataku 1-207, 28-1, Katsuragoshocho Nishikyo-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto / JP | 03 /
Ohnishi, Toyoji 3-7, Miharu 1-chome, Shinocho Kameoka-shi, Kyoto / JP | 04 /
Hasegawa, Yoshio, Mitsubishi Sai-5 Seimeiryo 18, Katsuragoschocho Nishiyo-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto / JP | 05 /
Yuge, Mitsuru Joy-Sagano 511, 27, Saganohirakimachi Ukyo-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto / JP | [1993/47] | Representative(s) | Blanco White, Henry Nicholas, et al ABEL & IMRAY 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/47] | Blanco White, Henry Nicholas, et al ABEL & IMRAY Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 93303732.7 | 14.05.1993 | [1993/47] | Priority number, date | JP19920126036 | 19.05.1992 Original published format: JP 12603692 | [1993/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0571137 | Date: | 24.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0571137 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/00, F15B21/04 | [1996/50] | CPC: |
F16H61/0276 (EP,US);
F16H59/00 (KR);
F16H2061/004 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/47] | F16H61/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/47] | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitsdruck-Steuereinrichtung für ein automatisches Kraftfahrzeug Getriebe | [1996/50] | English: | Fluid pressure control device for an automatic transmission in a vehicle | [1993/47] | French: | Dispositif de commande de pression fluidique pour une transmission automatique de véhicule | [1993/47] |
Former [1993/47] | Flüssigkeitsdruck-Steuereinrichtung für ein automatisches Kfz-Getriebe | Examination procedure | 20.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/29] | 20.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 04.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]JP04249648 ; | [A]JP03020161 ; | [A]JP61105223 ; | [A]AT35320B (LOEWENTHAL PHILIPP); | [A]US2061830 (CAMPBELL JULIAN A); | [A]DE1750501 (FELLER BAYER ALU METALL); | [A]DE7413011U ; | [A]US4524805 (HOFFMAN ALLAN C [US]) | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 026 (M-1354)19 January 1993 & JP-A-04 249648 ( SUZUKI ), & JP04249648 A 19930119 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 138 (M-1100)8 April 1991 & JP-A-03 020161 ( NISSAN ), & JP03020161 A 19910408 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 286 (M-521)27 September 1986 & JP-A-61 105223 ( AISIN WARNER ), & JP61105223 A 19860927 | Examination | US4887512 |