EP0573164 - Full feature high density EEPROM cell with poly tunnel spacer and method of manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NATIONAL SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION 2900 Semiconductor Drive, P.O. Box 58090 Santa Clara California 95052-8090 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | For all designated states NATIONAL SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION 2900 Semiconductor Drive, P.O. Box 58090 Santa Clara, California 95052-8090 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bergemont, Albert 5512 Castle Glen Avenue San Jose California 95129 / US | [1994/02] |
Former [1993/49] | 01 /
Bergemont, Albert 5512 Castle Glen Avenue Santa Clara, California 95014 / US | Representative(s) | Bowles, Sharon Margaret, et al BOWLES HORTON Felden House Dower Mews High Street Berkhamsted Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | Bowles, Sharon Margaret, et al BOWLES HORTON Felden House Dower Mews High Street Berkhamsted Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB | Application number, filing date | 93303793.9 | 17.05.1993 | [1993/49] | Priority number, date | US19920891710 | 01.06.1992 Original published format: US 891710 | [1993/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0573164 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0573164 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/115, H01L21/82, H01L29/788 | [1993/49] | CPC: |
H01L29/66825 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/2815 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/40114 (EP,US);
H01L29/7883 (EP,KR,US);
H10B41/00 (EP,US);
H01L27/105 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1993/49] | Title | German: | Mit allen Funktionen ausgestattete hochintegrierte EEPROM-Zelle mit Poly-Tunnel-Zwischenstück und Herstellungsverfahren | [1993/49] | English: | Full feature high density EEPROM cell with poly tunnel spacer and method of manufacture | [1993/49] | French: | Cellule EEPROM à haute densité d'intégration ayant toutes les fonctions et comportant un espaceur de tunnel en poly-si et procédé de fabrication | [1993/49] | Examination procedure | 06.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/42] | 14.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 01.07.1998 | CH | 01.07.1998 | FR | 01.07.1998 | IT | 01.07.1998 | LI | 01.07.1998 | NL | 01.07.1998 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | BE | 01.07.1998 | |
CH | 01.07.1998 | ||
FR | 01.07.1998 | ||
LI | 01.07.1998 | ||
NL | 01.07.1998 | ||
Former [2003/08] | BE | 01.07.1998 | |
CH | 01.07.1998 | ||
LI | 01.07.1998 | ||
NL | 01.07.1998 | ||
FR | 27.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/27] | BE | 01.07.1998 | |
CH | 01.07.1998 | ||
LI | 01.07.1998 | ||
FR | 27.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/22] | CH | 01.07.1998 | |
LI | 01.07.1998 | ||
FR | 27.11.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4258466 (KUO CHANG-KIANG, et al); | [A]EP0252027 (SGS MICROELETTRONICA SPA [IT]); | [Y]WO9011621 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]); | [Y]US5021848 (CHIU TE-LONG [US]) | [A] - IEEE ELECTRON DEVICE LETTERS. vol. 12, no. 8, August 1991NEW YORK US pages 450 - 451 EITAN BOAZ ET AL. 'Alternate Metal Virtual Ground (AMG)- A New Scaling Concept for Very High-Density EPROM's' |