EP0573170 - Method of manufacture of high density EEPROM cell array [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/49] | High density EEPROM cell array with novel programming scheme and method of manufacture | ||
[2002/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NATIONAL SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION 2900 Semiconductor Drive, P.O. Box 58090 Santa Clara California 95052-8090 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | For all designated states NATIONAL SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION 2900 Semiconductor Drive, P.O. Box 58090 Santa Clara, California 95052-8090 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bergemont, Albert 5512 Castle Glen Avenue Santa Clara, California 95014 / US | [1993/49] | Representative(s) | Bowles, Sharon Margaret, et al BOWLES HORTON Felden House Dower Mews High Street Berkhamsted Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | Bowles, Sharon Margaret, et al BOWLES HORTON Felden House Dower Mews High Street Berkhamsted Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB | Application number, filing date | 93303824.2 | 18.05.1993 | [1993/49] | Priority number, date | US19920891705 | 01.06.1992 Original published format: US 891705 | [1993/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0573170 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0573170 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/115, H01L21/82, H01L29/788 | [1993/49] | CPC: |
G11C16/10 (EP,US);
G11C16/14 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/7883 (EP,KR,US);
H10B41/30 (EP,US);
H10B69/00 (EP,US);
Y10S438/972 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1993/49] | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren einer EEPROM-Zellen-Matrix | [2002/49] | English: | Method of manufacture of high density EEPROM cell array | [2002/49] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un reseau de celles EEPROM | [2002/49] |
Former [1993/49] | EEPROM-Zellen-Matrix von hoher Dichte mit neuem Programmierschema und Herstellungsverfahren | ||
Former [1993/49] | High density EEPROM cell array with novel programming scheme and method of manufacture | ||
Former [1993/49] | Réseau de cellules EEPROM à haute densité d'intégration présentant un schéma de programmation nouveau et procédé de fabrication | Examination procedure | 07.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/42] | 21.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/50] | Request for further processing for: | 18.01.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 18.01.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.02.2002 | Decision despatched | 24.10.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 24.10.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.11.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 17.12.2003 | CH | 17.12.2003 | FR | 17.12.2003 | IT | 17.12.2003 | LI | 17.12.2003 | NL | 17.12.2003 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/32] | BE | 17.12.2003 | |
CH | 17.12.2003 | ||
FR | 17.12.2003 | ||
LI | 17.12.2003 | ||
NL | 17.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/52] | BE | 17.12.2003 | |
CH | 17.12.2003 | ||
LI | 17.12.2003 | ||
NL | 17.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/33] | CH | 17.12.2003 | |
LI | 17.12.2003 | ||
NL | 17.12.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP57106079 ; | [Y]US4258466 (KUO CHANG-KIANG, et al); | [A]GB2073488 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO); | [Y]WO9011621 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 6, no. 194 (E-134)(1072) 2 October 1982 & JP-A-57 106 079 ( TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA ) 1 July 1982, & JP57106079 A 19820701 | [A] - IEEE ELECTRON DEVICE LETTERS. vol. 12, no. 8, August 1991, NEW YORK US pages 450 - 451 EITAN BOAZ ET AL. 'Alternate Metal Virtual Ground (AMG)- A New Scaling Concept for Very High-Density EPROM's' |