EP0576146 - Cooking appliance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.07.1998 [1998/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/52] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohta, Nobuaki, c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation, 1-1-1, Shibaura, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1993/52] | Representative(s) | Muir, Ian Robertson, et al Haseltine Lake Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/52] | Muir, Ian R., et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 93304017.2 | 25.05.1993 | [1993/52] | Priority number, date | JP19920134934 | 27.05.1992 Original published format: JP 13493492 | JP19920138559 | 29.05.1992 Original published format: JP 13855992 | [1993/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0576146 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0576146 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F24C7/08, H05B1/02, H05B6/68 | [1993/52] | CPC: |
H05B6/6482 (EP,US);
F24C7/087 (EP,US);
H05B6/66 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/52] | Title | German: | Kochvorrichtung | [1993/52] | English: | Cooking appliance | [1993/52] | French: | Dispositif de cuisson | [1993/52] | Examination procedure | 14.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/52] | 25.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4008827 (MIELE & CIE [DE]); | [A]DE3129802 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]); | [A]US4625086 (KARINO HISAO [JP]) |