EP0573211 - Distributed switching in bidirectional multiplex section-switched ring transmission systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.08.2000 [2000/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1994/40] |
Former [1993/49] | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marra, William C. 421 Beth Avenue Bricktown, New Jersey 08724 / US | 02 /
Slavinskas, Darius D. 69 Bonnie Drive North Middletown, New Jersey 07734 / US | 03 /
Soulliere, Mark J. 30 Broad Street Apt. 4 Manasquan, New Jersey 07836 / US | [1993/49] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al AT&T (UK) LTD., AT&T Intellectual Property Division, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | ||
Former [1993/49] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk AT&T (UK) LTD. 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 93304119.6 | 27.05.1993 | [1993/49] | Priority number, date | US19920892079 | 02.06.1992 Original published format: US 892079 | [1993/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0573211 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0573211 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0573211 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/42 | [1993/49] | CPC: |
H04J3/085 (EP,US);
H04J2203/0042 (EP,US);
H04J2203/006 (EP,US);
H04J2203/0089 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1993/49] | Title | German: | Verteilte Vermittlung in einem Ringübertragungssystem mit multiplexten bidirektionalen vermittelten Stufen | [1993/49] | English: | Distributed switching in bidirectional multiplex section-switched ring transmission systems | [1993/49] | French: | Commutation distribué dans un système de transmission en anneau bidirectionnel avec des sections de commutation multiplexées | [1993/49] | Examination procedure | 09.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/02] | 20.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA] - I. HAQUE ET AL., "Self Healing Rings in a Synchronous Environment", IEEE LTS, NORTH ANDOVER, US, (199111), vol. 2, no. 4, pages 30 - 37, XP000241849 [Y] 1,3,6,8 * page 31, column L, line 21 - page 32, column R, line 16 * * page 35, column R, line 26 - page 36, column L, line 10 * * figure 3 * [A] 4,9 | [YA] - S.H. HERSEY ET AL., "ARCHITECTURES AND APPLICATIONS OF SONET IN A SELF-HEALING NETWORK", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, NEW YORK, US, (199106), vol. 3, pages 1412 - 1424 [Y] 1,3,6,8 * page 1421, column R, line 10 - line 26 * [A] 4,9 | [A] - D. VAN LAETHEM ET AL., "A RING NETWORK FOR INDUSTRIAL PROCESSES AND DISTRIBUTED SYSTEMS", EUROMICRO '81, (198109), pages 91 - 98 [A] 1,6 * paragraph [05.4] * * figure 1 * | [A] - T. WU ET AL., "A Class of Self-healing Ring Architectures for SONET Network Applications", GLOBECOM '90, NEW YORK, US, (199012), vol. 1, pages 444 - 451 [A] 1,5,6,10 * paragraph [03.2] * | [A] - H. DAVIE ET AL., "A self reconfiguring communication ring for distributed computer control schemes.", SOFTWARE ENGINEERING JOURNAL, LONDON GB, (198310), vol. 2, no. 5, pages 114 - 120 [A] 1,6 * paragraph [03.4] * | [A] - G. CARIOLARO ET AL., "SIGNAL THEORY FOR SONET STM-1", INTERNATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSMPOSIUM, NEW YORK, US, (199009), pages 26 - 32 [A] 2,7 * paragraph [0005] * |