EP0573221 - The sulphate salt of a substituted triazole, pharmaceutical compositions thereof, and their use in therapy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.1999 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.04.1999 [1999/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MERCK SHARP & DOHME LTD. Hertford Road Hoddesdon, Hertfordshire EN11 9NU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | For all designated states MERCK SHARP & DOHME LTD. Hertford Road Hoddesdon Hertfordshire EN11 9NU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baker, Raymond Bulls Cottage, Green Tye Much Hadham, Hertfordshire SG10 6JN / GB | 02 /
Pitt, Kendal G. 110 Bull Stag Green Hatfield, Hertfordshire AL9 5DE / GB | 03 /
Matassa, Victor G. The Duck Street Barns Furneux Pelham, Hertfordshire SG9 0LA / GB | 04 /
Storey, David E. 127 Kelsey Drive Lansdale, PA 19446 / US | 05 /
Olive, Carole 127 Kelsey Drive Lansdale, PA 19446 / US | 06 /
Street, Leslie J. 99 Spruce Hill Harlow, Essex CM18 7ST / GB | 07 /
Guiblin, Alexander Richard 13 Spencers Croft Harlow, Essex CM18 6JX / GB | [1994/35] |
Former [1994/07] | 01 /
Baker, Raymond Bulls Cottage, Green Tye Much Hadham, Hertfordshire SG10 6JN / GB | ||
02 /
Pitt, Kendal G. 110 Bull Stag Green Hatfield, Hertfordshire AL9 5DE / GB | |||
03 /
Matassa, Victor G. The Duck Street Barns Furneux Pelham, Hertfordshire SG9 0LA / GB | |||
04 /
Storey, David E. 127 Kelsey Drive Lansdale, PA 19446 / US | |||
05 /
Olive, Carole 127 Kelsey Drive Lansdale, PA 19446 / US | |||
06 /
Street, Leslie J. 99 Spruce Hill Harlow, Essex CM18 7ST / GB | |||
Former [1993/49] | 01 /
Baker, Raymond Bulls Cottage, Green Tye Much Hadham, Hertfordshire SG10 6JN / GB | ||
02 /
Pitt, Kendal G. 110 Bull Stag Green Hatfield, Hertfordshire AL9 5DE / GB | |||
03 /
Matassa, Victor G. The Duck Street Barns Furneux Pelham, Hertfordshire SG9 0LA / GB | |||
04 /
Storey, David E. 1007 Braeburn Terrace Lansdale, PA 19446 / US | |||
05 /
Olive, Carole 1007 Braeburn Terrace Lansdale, PA 19446 / US | |||
06 /
Street, Leslie J. 99 Spruce Hill Harlow, Essex CM18 7ST / GB | Representative(s) | Thompson, John, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | Thompson, John Dr., et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 93304158.4 | 28.05.1993 | [1993/49] | Priority number, date | GB19920011903 | 05.06.1992 Original published format: GB 9211903 | GB19930007306 | 07.04.1993 Original published format: GB 9307306 | [1993/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0573221 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0573221 | Date: | 29.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/06, A61K31/41 | [1993/49] | CPC: |
C07D249/08 (EP,US);
C07D403/06 (KR);
A61K31/41 (KR);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1993/49] | Title | German: | Sulfatsalz von einem substituierten Triazol, seine pharmazeutischen Zusammensetzungen und ihre Verwendung in Therapie | [1993/49] | English: | The sulphate salt of a substituted triazole, pharmaceutical compositions thereof, and their use in therapy | [1993/49] | French: | Sel de sulphate d'un triazole substitué, ses compositions pharmaceutiques et leur application en thérapeutique | [1993/49] | Examination procedure | 13.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/28] | 21.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0313397 (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]); | [APD]EP0497512 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [GB]) |