EP0577264 - A semiconductor device comprising a plurality of semiconductor chips [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2000 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.11.2000 [2000/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 1-1, Tanabeshinden, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki 210 / JP | [1994/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murakami, Yukio 4494-1 Hatacho Higashi-tukumagun, Nagano 390-14 / JP | [1994/01] | Representative(s) | Bridge-Butler, Alan James, et al Baron Warren Redfern 19 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/48] | Bridge-Butler, Alan James, et al G.F. Redfern & Co., 7 Staple Inn, Holborn London WC1V 7QF / GB | ||
Former [1994/01] | Topley, Paul, et al G.F. Redfern & Co. Redfern House 149/151 Tarring Road Worthing West Sussex BN11 4HE / GB | Application number, filing date | 93304170.9 | 28.05.1993 | [1994/01] | Priority number, date | JP19920169730 | 29.06.1992 Original published format: JP 16973092 | [1994/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0577264 | Date: | 05.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0577264 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01L25/07, H01L23/495 | [1994/01] | CPC: |
H01L23/49575 (EP,US);
H01L24/32 (EP,US);
H01L25/072 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1301 (EP,US);
H01L2924/181 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/1301, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/181, H01L2924/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/01] | Title | German: | Halbleiteranordnung mit mehreren Halbleiterchips | [1994/01] | English: | A semiconductor device comprising a plurality of semiconductor chips | [1994/01] | French: | Dispositif semi-conducteur comprenant une pluralité de puces semi-conductrices | [1994/01] | Examination procedure | 26.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/25] | 05.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2819327 (SEMIKRON GLEICHRICHTERBAU); | [A]EP0292848 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [DE]); | [A]FR2395603 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]EP0455322 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) |