EP0575110 - Compressing and expanding digital signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.09.1999 [1999/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/37] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1993/51] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akagiri, Kenzo, Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa Tokyo 141 / JP | [1993/51] | Representative(s) | Cotter, Ivan John, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/21] | Cotter, Ivan John, et al D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | ||
Former [1993/51] | Targett, Kenneth Stanley D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 93304546.0 | 11.06.1993 | [1993/51] | Priority number, date | JP19920156982 | 16.06.1992 Original published format: JP 15698292 | [1993/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0575110 | Date: | 22.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0575110 | Date: | 26.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0575110 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/66 | [1993/51] | CPC: |
H03G7/007 (EP,US);
H04B1/64 (KR);
H04B1/665 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/51] | Title | German: | Kompression und Dehnung von digitalen Signalen | [1993/51] | English: | Compressing and expanding digital signals | [1993/51] | French: | Compression et décompression de signaux numériques | [1993/51] | Examination procedure | 20.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/33] | 25.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0423050 (FRANCE ETAT [FR]) [A] 21,22* abstract *; | [A]EP0424016 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1-6,9-14,17-19 * page 2, line 40 - page 3, line 9 * * page 5, line 4 - page 6, line 25; figure 2 *; | [A] - MAHIEUX ET AL, "Transform Coding of Audio Signals at 64 Kbits/s", GLOBECOM '90, NY, (199012), vol. 1, doi:doi:10.1109/GLOCOM.1990.116565, pages 518 - 522, XP000218782 [A] 1,7-9,15-20 * abstract * * page 520, column L, line 61 - page 521, column L, line 33 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/GLOCOM.1990.116565 | [A] - THEILE ET AL, "Low bit-rate coding of high-quality audio signals An introduction to the MASCAM system", EBU REVIEW- TECHNICAL, BRUSSELS BE, (198808), no. 230, pages 158 - 181, XP000003955 [A] 1,7-9,15-20 * page 162, column L, line 17 - page 164, column L, line 2; figures 4,5 * | Examination | EP0420745 | EP0525809 | EP0554081 |