EP0577280 - Process for the dehydrogenation of hydrocarbons using a carbonaceous catalyst [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.1995 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.05.1995 [1995/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390 180 Park Avenue Florham Park New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/01] | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390, 180 Park Avenue Florham Park, New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kerby, Michael Charles, Jr. 10731 McShay Avenue Baton Rouge, LA 70810 / US | 02 /
Bearden, Roby, Jr. 505 Stanford Avenue Baton Rouge, LA 70808 / US | 03 /
Davis, Stephen Mark 15739 Chickamauga Drive Baton Rouge, LA 70817 / US | [1994/01] | Representative(s) | Somers, Harold Arnold, et al ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Mailpoint 12 Esso House, Ermyn Way Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/01] | Somers, Harold Arnold, et al ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Mailpoint 72 Esso House Ermyn Way Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB | Application number, filing date | 93304556.9 | 11.06.1993 | [1994/01] | Priority number, date | US19920900977 | 18.06.1992 Original published format: US 900977 | [1994/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0577280 | Date: | 05.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07C5/333, C07C11/09, B01J21/18 | [1994/01] | CPC: |
C07C5/321 (EP);
B01J21/18 (EP);
B01J37/084 (EP);
C07C5/333 (EP);
C07C2521/18 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C5/333, C07C11/09 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Dehydrierung von Kohlenwasserstoffen unter Verwendung eines Kohlenstoff enthaltenden Katalysators | [1994/01] | English: | Process for the dehydrogenation of hydrocarbons using a carbonaceous catalyst | [1994/01] | French: | Procédé pour la déshydrogénation d'hydrocarbures en utilisant un catalyseur contenant du charbon | [1994/01] | File destroyed: | 04.09.2001 | Examination procedure | 06.07.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/18] | 11.11.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1995/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE617595 ; | [Y]GB779380 ; | [X]FR814712 ; | [X]FR1226464 ; | [X]DE1963697 ; | [X]DE898297 ; | [X]DE890955 ; | [A]US3671424 ; | [A]GB1395953 ; | [X]SU353538 | [X] - DATABASE WPI Week 7834, Derwent Publications Ltd., LondonGB; AN 78-61647A & SU-A-353 538 (AZERB AZIZBEKOV PETROCHE) |