EP0587271 - Continuous cutter for severing pieces of equal length from a coiled elongate article [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.1998 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.01.1999 [1999/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHOWA ALUMINUM CORPORATION 224-banchi, Kaizancho 6-cho Sakaishi Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/36] | For all designated states SHOWA ALUMINUM CORPORATION 224-banchi, Kaizancho 6-cho Sakaishi, Osaka / JP | ||
Former [1994/11] | For all designated states SHOWA ALUMINUM KABUSHIKI KAISHA 224-banchi Kaizancho 6-cho Sakaishi Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ouchi, Wataru c/o 224-banchi, Kaizancho 6-cho Sakaishi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Morita, Taizo c/o 224-banchi, Kaizancho 6-cho Sakaishi, Osaka / JP | 03 /
Tagawa, Shinya c/o 224-banchi, Kaizancho 6-cho Sakaishi, Osaka / JP | [1994/11] | Representative(s) | Thomson, Paul Anthony Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | Thomson, Paul Anthony Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 93304573.4 | 11.06.1993 | [1994/11] | Priority number, date | JP19920238208 | 07.09.1992 Original published format: JP 23820892 | [1994/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0587271 | Date: | 16.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0587271 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B23D25/02, B23D25/04 | [1994/11] | CPC: |
B23D25/04 (EP,US);
B23D21/00 (KR);
B23D33/006 (KR);
B23D33/02 (KR);
Y10T225/12 (EP,US);
Y10T83/4757 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1994/11] | Title | German: | Fliegende Schere zum Abschneiden von gleichlangen Werkstücken aus einem aufgewickelten Artikel | [1994/11] | English: | Continuous cutter for severing pieces of equal length from a coiled elongate article | [1994/11] | French: | Cisaille volante pour la coupe de pièces d'égale longueur à partir d'un article de grande longueur sur bobine | [1994/11] | Examination procedure | 13.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/45] | 18.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP62003840 ; | [A]DE2410578 (SCHMITZ WALZMASCH); | [A]DE2739327 (ARENCO BMD MASCHFAB); | [A]EP0391747 (BORZYM ALEXANDER [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 172 (M-595)3 June 1987 & JP-A-62 003 840 ( SHOWA ALUM CORP ) 9 January 1987, & JP62003840 A 19870109 |