EP0577308 - Input device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.02.1999 [1999/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/01] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lowe, Anthony Cyril 7 Waters Edge, Skelmorlie Ayrshire, PA17 5DR / GB | 02 /
Pietrzak, Christopher C. 6 Drayton Street, Stanmore Winchester, Hampshire, S022 4BJ / GB | [1994/01] | Representative(s) | Burt, Roger James IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/01] | Burt, Roger James, Dr. IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 93304842.3 | 21.06.1993 | [1994/01] | Priority number, date | GB19920013913 | 30.06.1992 Original published format: GB 9213913 | [1994/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0577308 | Date: | 05.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0577308 | Date: | 04.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0577308 | Date: | 18.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G06K11/08 | [1994/01] | CPC: |
G06F3/0423 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/01] | Title | German: | Eingabegerät | [1994/01] | English: | Input device | [1994/01] | French: | Dispositif d'entrée | [1994/01] | Examination procedure | 29.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/26] | 12.05.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.08.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0366112 (WACOM CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,5,7 * abstract * * column 6, line 57 - column 8, line 19; figures 1A,1B,2 *; | [Y]EP0301715 (EMI PLC THORN [GB]) [Y] 1,5,7 * abstract * * column 2, line 13 - line 49; figure 1 *; | [PA]US5173793 (PURCELL ALEXANDER M [US]) [PA] 1 * column 2, line 38 - line 52; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0374767 (AMP INC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO9003014 (AMP INC [US]) [A] 1,10 * page 5, paragraph L - page 8, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 * | Examination | EP0520669 |