EP0576268 - Spectacle lens production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2001 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.09.2001 [2001/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOYA CORPORATION 7-5, Naka-Ochiai 2-Chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 161 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/52] | For all designated states HOYA CORPORATION 7-5, Naka-Ochiai 2-Chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 161 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saigo, Tsuyoshi 13-11, Midorigaoka 2-chome Hamura-shi, Tokyo 190-11 / JP | 02 /
Koseki, Takeo Hamura-danchi 19-405, Fujimidaira 2-chome 9 Hamura-shi, Tokyo 190-11 / JP | 03 /
Kikuchi, Yoshihiro Kanda-Heights 202, Ninomiya 276-1 Akikawa-shi, Tokyo 197 / JP | 04 /
Hatanaka, Takashi Akitsuichibankan 912, 30-1, Akitsumachi 5-chome Higashimurayama-shi, Tokyo 189 / JP | [1993/52] | Representative(s) | Betten, Jürgen, et al Betten & Resch Patentanwälte Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/22] | Betten, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Betten & Resch Patentanwälte Reichenbachstrasse 19 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/52] | Fane, Christopher Robin King, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London, WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 93304899.3 | 23.06.1993 | [1993/52] | Priority number, date | JP19920165912 | 24.06.1992 Original published format: JP 16591292 | JP19920211645 | 07.08.1992 Original published format: JP 21164592 | [1993/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0576268 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0576268 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60, G02C13/00 | [2000/11] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
B24B49/02 (EP,US);
B24B51/00 (EP,US);
B24B9/148 (EP,US);
G02C13/003 (EP,US);
G06Q10/087 (EP,US);
G06Q10/10 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1993/52] | G06F15/24, // G02C13/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1993/52] | Title | German: | Herstellung von Brillenlinsen | [1993/52] | English: | Spectacle lens production | [1993/52] | French: | Production de verres de lunettes | [1993/52] | Examination procedure | deleted | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No | 23.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/34] | 12.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 28.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.03.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP01113984.7 / EP1147852 | EP01114048.0 / EP1147853 | EP01114049.8 / EP1147854 | EP04019060.5 / EP1475187 | EP98110010.0 / EP0865871 | EP98110011.8 / EP0867261 | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0092364 (HANWELL OPTICAL [GB]); | [A]EP0299690 (VISTAKON INC [US]); | [A]EP0363281 (TOPCON CORP [JP]); | [A]US5117354 (LONG GARY R [US], et al) |