EP0579412 - 1,2,4-trioxygenated benzene derivatives useful as a leukotriene antagonists [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.09.1999 [1999/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/03] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, Indiana 46285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sofia, Michael Joseph 20 Bennett Road Carmel, Indiana 46032 / US | [1994/03] | Representative(s) | Hudson, Christopher Mark, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/32] | Hudson, Christopher Mark, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | ||
Former [1994/03] | Hudson, Christopher Mark Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 93305090.8 | 29.06.1993 | [1994/03] | Priority number, date | US19920907492 | 01.07.1992 Original published format: US 907492 | [1994/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0579412 | Date: | 19.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0579412 | Date: | 07.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07D311/66, C07D257/04, A61K31/35, A61K31/41 | [1994/03] | CPC: |
C07D257/04 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D311/66 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1998/25] |
Former [1994/03] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | In Stellung 1,2,4 sauerstoffsubstituierte Benzene Derivate, nützlich als Leukotrien Antagonisten | [1994/03] | English: | 1,2,4-trioxygenated benzene derivatives useful as a leukotriene antagonists | [1994/03] | French: | Benzene oxygenès aux positions 1,2 et 4 utiles comme antagonistes de leukotriens | [1994/03] | Examination procedure | 05.07.1993 | Examination requested [1994/03] | 16.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0132366 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [A] 1,2,4-9 * claims 1,6-8 *; | [A]EP0336068 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [A] 1,2,4-9 * claims 1,9-13 *; | [A]EP0150447 (SEARLE & CO [US]) [A] 1,2,4-9 *pages 4-6*;; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0108592 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [A] 1,2,4-9 * page 54, line 9 - page 56, line 22; claims 1,9,10 * | [PX] - MICHAEL J. SOFIA ET AL, "Ortho-alkoxyphenol leukotriene B4 receptor antagonists", BIOORGANIC AND MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (1992), vol. 2, no. 12, pages 1669 - 1674 [PX] 1-9 * the whole document * | [PX] - MICHAEL J. SOFIA ET AL, "Ortho-alkoxyphenol leukotriene B4 receptor antagonists:effect of a chroman carboxylic acid", BIOORGANIC AND MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (1992), vol. 2, no. 12, pages 1675 - 1680 [PX] 1-9 * the whole document * |