EP0578442 - Improved hopper and filter chamber for direct forward throw sweeper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.1998 [1998/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TENNANT COMPANY 701 North Lilac Drive Minneapolis Minnesota 55422 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/02] | For all designated states Tennant Company 701 North Lilac Drive Minneapolis Minnesota 55422 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hennessey, Robert D. 1905 Gettysburg Avenue N. Golden Valley, Minnesota 55427 / US | 02 /
LaRocque, Timothy G. 4830 Valley Forge Lane Plymouth, Minnesota 55442 / US | [1994/02] | Representative(s) | Heath, Derek James, et al BROMHEAD & CO. 19 Buckingham Street London WC2N 6EF / GB | [1994/02] | Application number, filing date | 93305175.7 | 01.07.1993 | [1994/02] | Priority number, date | US19920910634 | 08.07.1992 Original published format: US 910634 | [1994/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0578442 | Date: | 12.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0578442 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | E01H1/08 | [1994/02] | CPC: |
E01H1/0854 (EP,US);
E01H1/047 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1994/02] | Title | German: | Behälter und Filterkammer für vorwärtskehrende Kehrrichtmaschinen | [1994/02] | English: | Improved hopper and filter chamber for direct forward throw sweeper | [1994/02] | French: | Tremie et chambre à filtration pour balayeuse projetant les déchets vers l'avant | [1994/02] | Examination procedure | 01.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/17] | 06.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1995 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   03.11.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1114343 (TENNANT CO G H); | [X]FR2006091 (TENNANT CO); | [Y]US3604051 (WENDEL ADOLPH H, et al); | [A]US4459719 (NOTESTINE RICHARD H [US]); | [Y]EP0436273 (AAR CORP [US]) |