EP0578453 - Zirconia based shot media [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.10.1998 [1998/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOSOH CORPORATION No. 4560, Kaisei-cho, Shinnanyo-shi Yamaguchi-ken 746 / JP | For all designated states NIKKATO CORP. 2-24, Orionocho 3-cho Sakai-shi Osaka-fu 590 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/02] | For all designated states TOSOH CORPORATION No. 4560, Kaisei-cho, Shinnanyo-shi Yamaguchi-ken 746 / JP | ||
For all designated states NIKKATO CORP. 2-24, Orionocho 3-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka-fu 590 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawanami, Toshio 153-1, Kitanoda Sakai-shi, Osaka-fu 588 / JP | 02 /
Ohnishi, Hiroshi 445-20, Kenacho Sakai-shi, Osaka-fu 593 / JP | 03 /
Matsumura, Hiroyuki 1-5, Shiigi-cho Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 746 / JP | 04 /
Aimoto, Michiyuki 5-22, Nishiyanagi 1-chome Kudamatsu-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 744 / JP | 05 /
Arakawa, Toshihiko 10-3, Madokoro 4-chome Shinannyo-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 746 / JP | 06 /
Ogai, Michiharu 3-24, Nijigaoka 5-chome Hikari-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 743 / JP | [1994/02] | Representative(s) | Kearney, Kevin David Nicholas, et al KILBURN & STRODE 20 Red Lion Street London, WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/02] | Kearney, Kevin David Nicholas, et al KILBURN & STRODE 30 John Street London, WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 93305219.3 | 02.07.1993 | [1994/02] | Priority number, date | JP19920197408 | 02.07.1992 Original published format: JP 19740892 | JP19930075639 | 01.04.1993 Original published format: JP 7563993 | [1994/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0578453 | Date: | 12.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0578453 | Date: | 22.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B24C11/00, C09K3/14 | [1994/02] | CPC: |
C09K3/1418 (EP,US);
B24C11/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/02] | Title | German: | Strahlmedium auf der Basis von Zirkonium(di)oxid | [1994/02] | English: | Zirconia based shot media | [1994/02] | French: | Produit de grenaillage à base de zircon | [1994/02] | Examination procedure | 14.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/19] | 01.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP3208561 ; | [A]US3929498 (HANCOCK JOHN DOUGLAS, et al); | [Y]US4035962 (AYERS JOSEPH W); | [A]EP0129188 (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT [DE]); | [A]EP0314939 (DEGUSSA [DE]); | [Y]EP0351827 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) | [A] - DATABASE WPIL Week 9143, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 91-313933 & JP-A-3 208 561 (SUMITOMO METAL IND KK), & JP3208561 A 00000000 |