EP0581457 - Use of cytisine compounds for the manufacture of a medicament for the treatment of neurodegenerative diseases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.1995 [1995/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY 401 North Main Street Winston-Salem North Carolina 27102 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/05] | For all designated states R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY 401 North Main Street Winston-Salem North Carolina 27102 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lippiello, Patrick M. 8815 Homewood Drive Clemmons, North Carolina 27012 / US | 02 /
Caldwell, William S. 208 Capistrano Drive Winston-Salem, North Carolina 27103 / US | [1994/05] | Representative(s) | Skailes, Humphrey John Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/05] | Skailes, Humphrey John Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93305274.8 | 06.07.1993 | [1994/05] | Priority number, date | US19920909906 | 07.07.1992 Original published format: US 909906 | [1994/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0581457 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/435 | [1994/05] | CPC: |
A61K31/44 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1994/05] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Cytisinverbindungen zur Herstellung eines Arzneimittels zur Behandlung von neurodegenerativen Krankheiten | [1994/05] | English: | Use of cytisine compounds for the manufacture of a medicament for the treatment of neurodegenerative diseases | [1994/05] | French: | Utilisation de composés de cytisine pour la fabrication d'un médicament pour le traitement de maladies neurodégénératives | [1994/05] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 17.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/36] | 17.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/52] | 30.06.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1995 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0377520 (ELAN CORP PLC [IE]) | [YD] - J.NEUROSCI.RES. vol. 27, 1990, pages 548 - 560 E.GIACOBINI 'Cholinergic receptors in human brain: effects of aging and Alzheimer disease' | [Y] - NEUROLOGY vol. 38, no. 5, 1988, pages 720 - 723 P.J.WHITEHOUSE 'Reductions in (3H)nicotinic acetylcholine binding in Alzheimer's disease and Parkinson's disease' | [Y] - J.NEUROCHEM. vol. 45, no. 2, 1985, pages 427 - 433 ROCHELLE D. SCHWARTZ ET AL. 'In vivo regulation of (3H)acetylcholine recognition sites in brain by nicotinic cholinergic drugs' |