EP0586056 - Medical coupling devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.04.1999 [1999/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states William A. Cook Australia Pty. Ltd. 12 Electronics Street, Brisbane Technology Park Eight Mile Plains, Brisbane Queensland 4113 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [1994/10] | For all designated states William A. Cook Australia Pty. Ltd. 12 Electronics Street, Brisbane Technology Park Eight Miles Plains, Brisbane, Queensland 4113 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reeves, Geoff 123 Kloske Road Burbank, Queensland / AU | [1994/10] | Representative(s) | Johnston, Kenneth Graham Lucent Technologies EUR-IP UK Ltd Unit 18, Core 3 Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield, EN3 7XB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/10] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 93305302.7 | 06.07.1993 | [1994/10] | Priority number, date | AU19920003350 | 07.07.1992 Original published format: AU 335092 | [1994/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0586056 | Date: | 09.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0586056 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/425, A61B17/435, A61M1/00, A61M39/00 | [1998/16] | CPC: |
A61B17/435 (EP,US);
A61B2217/005 (EP,US);
A61B2217/007 (EP,US);
A61M2205/6081 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/10] | A61B17/425, A61M1/00, A61M39/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/10] | Title | German: | Medizinische Kupplungseinrichtungen | [1994/10] | English: | Medical coupling devices | [1994/10] | French: | Dispositifs médicaux d'accouplement | [1994/10] | Examination procedure | 05.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/44] | 26.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/14] | Request for further processing for: | 27.01.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 28.01.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.02.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4824434 (SEITZ JR H MICHAEL [US]); | [Y]DE3522782 (PETER BREHM CHIR MECHANIK WERK [DE]); | [Y]US3577992 (MERRY JACK D, et al); | [X]EP0337617 (WALLACE LTD H G [GB]) |