EP0579487 - Coupling construction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.10.1998 [1998/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS, LTD. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi City Mie Pref. / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/03] | For all designated states SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS, LTD. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi City Mie Pref. / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Imanishi, Hisao, c/o Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi City, Mie Pref. / JP | [1994/03] | Representative(s) | Alexander, Thomas Bruce, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam gardens 70, Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/43] | Alexander, Thomas Bruce, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | ||
Former [1994/03] | Flegg, Christopher Frederick, et al Boult, Wade & Tennant 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93305504.8 | 14.07.1993 | [1994/03] | Priority number, date | JP19920189186 | 16.07.1992 Original published format: JP 18918692 | [1994/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0579487 | Date: | 19.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0579487 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0579487 | Date: | 22.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/627, H01R13/20, F02P3/02, H01T13/06 | [1995/03] | CPC: |
H01R13/20 (EP,US);
F02P3/02 (EP,US);
H01T13/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/03] | F02P13/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/03] | Title | German: | Kupplungssystem | [1997/43] | English: | Coupling construction | [1994/03] | French: | Construction d'un couplage | [1994/03] |
Former [1994/03] | Kupplungskonstruktion | Examination procedure | 23.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/17] | 05.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9208259 (CM SRL [IT]) [X] 1,4 * page 9, line 21 - page 11, line 13; figure - * [Y] 2,5,6,8; | [Y]US3246284 (FARISON GLENN S) [Y] 2,5,6,8 * column 1, line 1 - line 4; figure - *; | [A]EP0491626 (RADIALL IND [FR]) [A] 1,4,8 * abstract *; | [A]EP0340083 (VALEO ELECTRONIQUE [FR]) [A] 2,5,8 * figures 3,7 *; | [A]DE686115 (ERNST RADEMACHER) |