EP0584942 - Headlamp levelling system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.1998 [1998/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN EUROPEAN TECHNOLOGY CENTRE LIMITED Washington Road Sunderland Tyne & Wear SR5 3ND / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/09] | For all designated states NISSAN EUROPEAN TECHNOLOGY CENTRE LIMITED Washington Road Sunderland, Tyne & Wear SR5 3ND / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ahmed, Mahmoud 11 Kestrel Way Buckingham Buckinghamshire MK18 7JH / GB | [1994/09] | Representative(s) | Waldren, Robin Michael Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/09] | Waldren, Robin Michael MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 93305818.2 | 23.07.1993 | [1994/09] | Priority number, date | GB19920015809 | 24.07.1992 Original published format: GB 9215809 | [1994/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0584942 | Date: | 02.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0584942 | Date: | 13.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0584942 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/115, B60Q1/076 | [1994/26] | CPC: |
B60Q1/076 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1994/09] | B60Q1/115 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR [1994/09] | Title | German: | Höhenregelungssystem für Scheinwerfer | [1994/09] | English: | Headlamp levelling system | [1994/09] | French: | Dispositif de réclage de niveau pour phare | [1994/09] | Examination procedure | 16.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/46] | 11.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS59143731 ; | [A]EP0138217 (ICHIKOH INDUSTRIES LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JPS58152641 ; | [A]US4833573 (MIYAUCHI) [A] 1 * figure 12 *; | [A]GB744900 (DOWTY EQUIPMENT LIMITED) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]GB996905 (DOWTY ELECTRICS LIMITED) [A] 1 * figure 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841214), vol. 8, no. 274, Database accession no. (M - 345)<1711> , & JP59143731 A 00000000 (ICHIKO KOGYO KK) [X] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831208), vol. 7, no. 275, Database accession no. (M - 261)<1420> , & JP58152641 A 00000000 (ICHIKOH KOGYO KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |