EP0581575 - System for intensity-variable printing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/05] | System and method for intensity-variable printing | ||
[1999/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.12.2000 [2000/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEKTRONIX, INC. 26600 S W Parkway Avenue P.O. Box 1000 Wilsonville, Oregon 97070-1000 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/05] | For all designated states TEKTRONIX, INC. 26600 S W Parkway Avenue, P.O. Box 1000 Wilsonville, Oregon 97070-1000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clark, Jeffery J. 15234 SW Burgundy Street Tigard, Orgeon 97224 / US | 02 /
Crosby, Brian G. 22436 SW Pima Tualatin, Oregon 97062 / US | 03 /
Lewendal, Bo 10400 SW 133rd Avenue Beaverton, Oregon97500 / US | 04 /
Thornton, Gregory P. 9585 SW 69th Tigard, Oregon 97223 / US | [1994/05] | Representative(s) | Holmes, Matthew Peter, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/31] | Holmes, Matthew Peter, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | ||
Former [1995/28] | Lawrence, Malcolm Graham Hepworth, Lawrence, Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Bakers Lane Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [1994/05] | Lawrence, Malcolm Graham Hepworth, Lawrence, Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Bakers Lane Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93305936.2 | 27.07.1993 | [1994/05] | Priority number, date | US19920919864 | 27.07.1992 Original published format: US 919864 | [1994/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0581575 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0581575 | Date: | 23.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0581575 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/40 | [1994/05] | CPC: |
H04N1/4092 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/05] | Title | German: | System zum intensitätsvariablen Drucken | [1999/22] | English: | System for intensity-variable printing | [1999/22] | French: | Système pour l'impression à intensités variables | [1999/22] |
Former [1994/05] | System und Verfahren zum intensitätsvariablen Drucken | ||
Former [1994/05] | System and method for intensity-variable printing | ||
Former [1994/05] | Système et procédé pour l'impression à intensités variables | Examination procedure | 22.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/42] | 22.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 11.12.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/50] | Request for further processing for: | 18.12.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 18.12.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.02.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4884080 (HIRAHARA SHUZO [JP], et al) [A] 1,4,9,13-16,19,20,25 * column 1, line 17 - line 24 * * column 1, line 56 - line 66 * * column 17, line 12 - line 22 *; | [A]US3814847 (LONGUET M) [A] 1-5,7,9-11,16-18,20,21,23,25 * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 18 *; | [A]DE3117445 (TOYO ELECTRONICS IND CORP [JP]) [A] 4,20 * figure 1; claims 5,6 * |