EP0582477 - Method for diagnosing cancer and pharmaceutical composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.1995 | Change - withdrawal | published on 15.03.1995 [1995/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOSOH CORPORATION No. 4560, Kaisei-cho, Shinnanyo-shi Yamaguchi-ken 746 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/06] | For all designated states TOSOH CORPORATION No. 4560, Kaisei-cho, Shinnanyo-shi Yamaguchi-ken 746 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takeshi, Azuma 373, Kawarano-machi, Sagaru, Nijo, Higashitoin Nakagyo-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto / JP | 02 /
Hitoshi, Hori 4-26-5, Shonandai Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Takao, Matsuba Tosoh Atsugi Shataku No.203 1-10-39, Okada Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Hiroshi, Iida 6-9-5, Minamikurihara Zama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 05 /
Koji, Igarashi 4-16-21-202, Takaishi, Asao-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 06 /
Masayuki, Yamada 6-1-27, Wakamatsu Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1994/06] | Representative(s) | Kearney, Kevin David Nicholas, et al KILBURN & STRODE 20 Red Lion Street London, WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/06] | Kearney, Kevin David Nicholas, et al KILBURN & STRODE 30 John Street London, WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 93306204.4 | 05.08.1993 | [1994/06] | Priority number, date | JP19920229375 | 06.08.1992 Original published format: JP 22937592 | [1994/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0582477 | Date: | 09.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/574, C12Q1/68, A61K39/295 | [1994/06] | CPC: |
A61K39/3955 (EP);
A61K39/39558 (EP);
C07K16/30 (EP);
C07K16/303 (EP);
C07K16/40 (EP);
C12N9/6478 (EP);
C12Q1/6886 (EP);
G01N33/57438 (EP);
G01N33/57496 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/06] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Krebsdiagnose und pharmazeutische Zusammensetzung | [1994/06] | English: | Method for diagnosing cancer and pharmaceutical composition | [1994/06] | French: | Procédé par le diagnostic du cancer et composé pharmaceutique | [1994/06] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 20.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/37] | 03.08.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD] - T.SAKU ET AL., "Cathepsins D and E in normal, metaplastic, dysplastic, and carcinomatous gastric tissue: an immunohistological study.", GUT, (1991), vol. 31, pages 1250 - 1255 [XD] 1,4 * the whole document * | [X] - T.SHIRAISHI ET AL., "Slw Moving Proteinase in Gastric Cancer and Its Relationship to Pepsinogens I and II.", DIGESTIVE DISEASES AND SCIENCES, (198811), vol. 33, no. 11, pages 1466 - 1472 [X] 1,4 * the whole document * | [X] - R.FIOCCA ET AL., "The Foveolar Cell Component of Gastric Cancer", HUMAN PATHOLOGY, (199003), vol. 21, no. 3, pages 260 - 276 [X] 1,4 * Pages 260, 261,274,275. * | [X] - F.SESSA ET AL., "Ductal Cancers of the Pancreas Frequently Express markers of Gasterointestinal Epithelial Cells.", GASTEROENTEROLOGY, (199006), vol. 98, no. 6, pages 1655 - 1665 [X] 1,4 * the whole document * | [XY] - K.H.LAI ET AL., "Immunohistochemical staining of cathepsin E in digestive cancer.", GASTEROENTEROLOGY, (199204), vol. 102, no. 4, page A370 [X] 1,4 * abstract * [Y] 3 | [YP] - S.TSUKADA ET AL., "Tissue- and cell-cpecific control of guinea pig gene expression.", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (19920930), vol. 187, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/0006-291X(92)90458-W, pages 1401 - 1408, XP024771463 [YP] 3 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-291X(92)90458-W | [A] - N.P.BIRCH ET AL., "homology cloning of aspartic proteases from an endocrine cell line using the polymerase chain reaction.", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (19910628), vol. 177, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/0006-291X(91)90626-I, pages 920 - 926, XP024835995 [A] 3 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-291X(91)90626-I |