EP0583151 - Hemostatic clip cartridge with clip retaining means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.05.1995 [1995/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EDWARD WECK INC. One Weck Drive, P.O. Box 12600 Research Triangle Park North Carolina 27709 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/07] | For all designated states EDWARD WECK INC. One Weck Drive, P.O. Box 12600 Research Triangle Park, North Carolina 27709 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taylor, Warren 1210 Oxford Place Cary, North Carolina 27511 / US | [1994/07] | Representative(s) | Thomas, Roger Tamlyn D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1994/07] | Application number, filing date | 93306302.6 | 10.08.1993 | [1994/07] | Priority number, date | US19920929632 | 12.08.1992 Original published format: US 929632 | [1994/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0583151 | Date: | 16.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/12 | [1994/07] | CPC: |
A61B17/122 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1994/07] | Title | German: | Aufbewahrungssystem für häemostatische Klammern mit Klammerhaltemitteln | [1994/07] | English: | Hemostatic clip cartridge with clip retaining means | [1994/07] | French: | Cartouche pour pinces hémostatiques avec moyen de retenue des pinces | [1994/07] | File destroyed: | 09.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 17.08.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/18] | 07.12.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1995/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5046611 ; | [XD]EP0482861 ; | [XD]US4961499 ; | [XD]US4076120 ; | [AD]US3326216 ; | [AD]US4146130 |