EP0585127 - Thermal Recording sheet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.1998 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.12.1998 [1998/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON PAPER INDUSTRIES CO., LTD. 4-1, Oji 1-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/09] | For all designated states NIPPON PAPER INDUSTRIES CO., LTD. 4-1, Oji 1-chome Kita-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Minami, Toshiaki, c/o Res. Lab. of Product Devel. Nippon Paper Ind. Co., Ltd, 30-6 Kamiochiai 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Fukuchi, Tadakazu, c/o Res. Lab. of Product Devel. Nippon Paper Ind. Co., Ltd, 30-6 Kamiochiai 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1994/09] | Representative(s) | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1994/09] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 93306780.3 | 26.08.1993 | [1994/09] | Priority number, date | JP19920229526 | 28.08.1992 Original published format: JP 22952692 | JP19920229527 | 28.08.1992 Original published format: JP 22952792 | [1994/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0585127 | Date: | 02.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0585127 | Date: | 19.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0585127 | Date: | 29.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/40, B41M5/30 | [1994/09] | CPC: |
B41M5/3336 (EP,US);
B41M5/3375 (EP,US);
B41M5/42 (EP,US);
B41M2205/04 (EP,US);
B41M2205/38 (EP,US);
B41M5/323 (EP,US);
B41M5/3275 (EP,US);
B41M5/3372 (EP,US);
B41M5/426 (EP,US);
B41M5/44 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1994/09] | Title | German: | Wärmeempfindliche Aufzeichnungsschicht | [1994/09] | English: | Thermal Recording sheet | [1994/09] | French: | Feuille pour l'enregistrement par la chaleur | [1994/09] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/08] | 29.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.05.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.05.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH04128087 ; | [A]US4246312 (KOSAKA TAKAO, et al) [A] 1-9 * column 1, line 32 - column 2, line 42 ** example - *; | [A]EP0186375 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * page 4, line 12 - line 24 * * page 2, line 23 - page 3, line 5 *; | [A]EP0422680 (JUJO PAPER CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * page 2, line 27 - line 30 * * page 3, line 29 - line 31 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920818), vol. 16, no. 388, Database accession no. (M - 1297), & JP4128087 A 19920428 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD) [A] 1-9 * abstract * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 25, no. 92, Database accession no. 92-203160 [ ] * abstract * | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19920810), vol. 117, no. 6, Database accession no. 58995 [ ] * abstract * |