EP0586219 - Apparatus and method for image compression [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.04.2002 [2002/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toraichi, Kazuo 14-2, Irumagawa 1-chome Saitama-shi Saitama-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/10] | For all designated states Toraichi, Kazuo 14-2, Irumagawa 1-chome Saitama-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/10] | Representative(s) | Smith, Norman Ian, et al Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/10] | Smith, Norman Ian, et al F.J. CLEVELAND & COMPANY 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93306856.1 | 31.08.1993 | [1994/10] | Priority number, date | JP19920259137 | 01.09.1992 Original published format: JP 25913792 | JP19920269646 | 11.09.1992 Original published format: JP 26964692 | [1994/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0586219 | Date: | 09.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0586219 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/64 | [1994/10] | CPC: |
G06T9/20 (EP,US);
G06T11/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1994/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bildkompression | [1994/10] | English: | Apparatus and method for image compression | [1994/10] | French: | Méthode et appareil de compression d'image | [1994/10] | Examination procedure | 10.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/02] | 21.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/15] | 07.11.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS6075975 ; | [Y]GB2229337 (RICOH KK [JP]) [Y] 1-22 * page 2, line 13 - line 17; figure 2 * * page 5, line 25 - page 6, line 7 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850904), vol. 009, no. 217, Database accession no. (P - 385), & JP60075975 A 19850430 (SHIYAKEN:KK) [X] 1-22 * abstract * | [Y] - Bigelow C et al, "Digital typography", SCI. AM. (USA), SCIENTIFIC AMERICAN, AUG. 1983, USA, 249, 2, 94 - 105, ISSN 0036-8733 [Y] 1-22 * page 94, column M, line 26 - column R, line 1 * * Fig.: "Scaling the size" - Pag. 98 * * Fig.: "Storage Space" - Pag. 104 *; page 104, column M, line 5 - line 28 * | [A] - Coueignoux P, "Character generation by computer", COMPUT. GRAPH. IMAGE PROCESS. (USA), COMPUTER GRAPHICS AND IMAGE PROCESSING, JULY 1981, USA, 16, 3, 240 - 269, ISSN 0146-664X [A] 1-22 * page 246, line 45 - page 247, line 1 * * page 248, line 8 - line 13 * | [A] - Hersch R D et al, "Model-based matching and hinting of fonts", SIGGRAPH 91, LAS VEGAS, NV, USA, 28 JULY-2 AUG. 1991, 71 - 80, ISSN 0097-8930 [A] 1-22 * page 73, column R, line 16 - line 22; figures 7,8 * | [A] - Hersch R D, "Descriptive contour fill of partly degenerated shapes", IEEE COMPUT. GRAPH. APPL. (USA), IEEE COMPUTER GRAPHICS AND APPLICATIONS, JULY 1986, USA, 6, 7, 61 - 70, ISSN 0272-1716 [A] 1-22 * figure 2 * |