EP0603996 - Clock control apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.12.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2001 [2001/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/26] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Komatsuda, Hiroshi, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa, 211 / JP | [1994/26] | Representative(s) | Stebbing, Timothy Charles, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/26] | Stebbing, Timothy Charles, et al Haseltine Lake & Co. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 93307162.3 | 10.09.1993 | [1994/26] | Priority number, date | JP19920356926 | 23.12.1992 Original published format: JP 35692692 | [1994/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0603996 | Date: | 29.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0603996 | Date: | 28.01.1998 | [1998/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/06, G06F1/04 | [1998/05] | CPC: |
G06F1/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/26] | G06F1/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/26] | Title | German: | Taktsteuerungsvorrichtung | [1994/26] | English: | Clock control apparatus | [1994/26] | French: | Dispositif de commande d'horloge | [1994/26] | Examination procedure | 16.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/38] | 10.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/06] | 14.09.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2000 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4835728 (SI STEPHEN S C [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * column 5, line 1 - column 6, line 33 * * column 7, line 33 - column 8, line 12; figures 5-7 *; | [A]US4763297 (UHLENHOFF ARNOLD [DE]) [A] 1-17 * column 2, line 37 - line 63 *; | [A]US4849702 (WEST BURNELL G [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * column 2, line 47 - line 63 *; | [A]GB2187005 (CIRRUS DESIGNS LIMITED) [A] 1-17 * page 1, line 22 - line 30 * * page 1, line 61 - page 2, line 9 * * page 2, line 32 - line 43 * |