EP0588583 - Child resistant closure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.03.1998 [1998/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OWENS-ILLINOIS CLOSURE INC. One SeaGate Toledo Ohio 43666 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/12] | For all designated states OWENS-ILLINOIS CLOSURE INC. One SeaGate Toledo Ohio 43666 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fillmore, William E. 4445, Sylvania Avenue, Apt. C-2 Toledo, OH 43623 / US | 02 /
Kusz, Maximillian 345 S. River Road Waterville, OH 43566 / US | [1994/12] | Representative(s) | Votier, Sidney David, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [1994/12] | Application number, filing date | 93307202.7 | 13.09.1993 | [1994/12] | Priority number, date | US19920947208 | 18.09.1992 Original published format: US 947208 | [1994/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0588583 | Date: | 23.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0588583 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B65D50/04, B65D50/10 | [1994/12] | CPC: |
B65D50/041 (EP,US);
B65D50/068 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/12] | Title | German: | Kindersicherer Verschluss | [1994/12] | English: | Child resistant closure | [1994/12] | French: | Couvercle à l'épreuve des enfants | [1994/12] | Examination procedure | 18.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/42] | 11.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4065017 (BURTON GEORGE WILLIAM); | [AD]US4285437 (MORRIS GLENN H); | [A]US4998632 (MORRIS SR GLENN H [US]); | [A]US5020681 (KUSZ MAXIMILLIAN [US]) |