EP0589626 - Preparation of beta-methyl carbapenem intermediates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/10] | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | ||
Former [1994/13] | For all designated states MERCK & CO. INC. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Choi, Woog-Baeg 7 Regal Court North Brunswick, NJ 08902 / US | 02 /
Shinkai, Ichiro 1101 Prospect Street Westfield, NJ 07090 / US | 03 /
Humphrey, Guy R. 14 Walker Drive Belle Mead, NJ 08502 / US | 04 /
Thompson, Andrew S. 1144 Sawmill Road Mountainside, NJ 07092 / US | 05 /
Reider, Paul J. 621 Kimball Avenue Westfield, NJ 07090 / US | 06 /
Volante, Ralph P. 7 Scottsdale Court Cranberry, NJ 08512 / US | [1994/13] | Representative(s) | Cole, William Gwyn, et al European Patent Department Merck & Co., Inc. Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/13] | Cole, William Gwyn, et al European Patent Department Merck & Co., Inc. Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 93307322.3 | 16.09.1993 | [1994/13] | Priority number, date | US19920947186 | 18.09.1992 Original published format: US 947186 | [1994/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0589626 | Date: | 30.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0589626 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07D205/08, C07D405/04 | [1994/13] | CPC: |
C07D405/04 (EP,US);
C07D205/08 (EP,US);
Y02P20/55 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1994/13] | Title | German: | Herstellung von Zwischenprodukten für beta-Methyl-carbapeneme | [1994/13] | English: | Preparation of beta-methyl carbapenem intermediates | [1994/13] | French: | Préparation des composés intermédiaires pour des bêta-méthyl-carbapénèms | [1994/13] | Examination procedure | 30.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/48] | 25.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0052299 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) | [AP] - HETEROCYCLES, vol. 35, no. 1, 1993, pages 139 - 142 M. IHARA ET A. 'Synthesis of ...' | [A] - CHEMISTRY LETTERS, no. 4, 1990, pages 531 - 534 T. HONDA ET AL. 'An Efficient ...' | [A] - HETEROCYCLES, vol. 19, no. 6, 1982, pages 1023 - 1032 T. KAMETANI ET AL. 'Synthetic studies ...' | [AD] - JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, vol. 57, no. 8, April 1992, pages 2411 - 2418 D.R. BENDER ET AL. 'Diastereoselective Routes ...' | [AD] - TETRAHEDRON, vol. 48, no. 1, January 1992, pages 55 - 66 Y. KOBAYASHI ET AL. '" A highly stereoselective ...' | Examination | EP0546742 |