EP0595467 - Process for preparing antifolate 4-hydroxypyrrolo 2,3-d pyrimidine derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.07.2001 [2001/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/18] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, Indiana 46285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barnett, Charles Jackson 7540 North Pennsylvania Indianapolis, Indiana 46240 / US | 02 /
Wilson, Thomas Michael 1193 Greenlawn Speedway, Indiana 46224 / US | [1994/18] | Representative(s) | Hudson, Christopher Mark, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/18] | Hudson, Christopher Mark, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 93307594.7 | 24.09.1993 | [1994/18] | Priority number, date | US19920951483 | 25.09.1992 Original published format: US 951483 | [1994/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0595467 | Date: | 04.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0595467 | Date: | 22.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0595467 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, // (C07D487/04, 239:00, 209:00) | [1994/18] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
Y02P20/55 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1994/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Antifolaten 4-Hydroxypyrrolo 2,3-d pyrimidinderivaten | [1994/18] | English: | Process for preparing antifolate 4-hydroxypyrrolo 2,3-d pyrimidine derivatives | [1994/18] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de dérives antifolates de la 4-hydroxypyrrolo 2,3-d pyrimidine | [1994/18] | Examination procedure | 02.10.1993 | Examination requested [1994/18] | 18.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0402903 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [A] 1* page 5, line 43 - line 49; claim 1 * | [A] - J.A. SECRIST III ET AL., "Studies directed toward a total synthesis of nucleoside Q. The annulation of 2,6-diaminopyrimidin-4-one with alpha-halo carbonyls to form pyrrolo[2,3-d]pyrimidines and furo[2,3-d]pyrimidines", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, EASTON US, (1978), vol. 43, no. 20, pages 3937 - 3941 [A] 1 * page 3937, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 1; page 3941, column 1, compound 7 * |