EP0589728 - Boundary layer control systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITISH AEROSPACE PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY Warwick House, P.O. Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough Hants. GU14 6YU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/13] | For all designated states BRITISH AEROSPACE PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY Warwick House, P.O. Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough, Hants. GU14 6YU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Majdalawi, Fouad British Aerospace Airbus Ltd., Filton House Filton, Bristol, BS99 7AR / GB | 02 /
Nayfeh, Ali Hasan 300 Murphy Street Blacksburg, Virginia 24060 / US | [1994/13] | Application number, filing date | 93307622.6 | 27.09.1993 | [1994/13] | Priority number, date | GB19920020250 | 25.09.1992 Original published format: GB 9220250 | [1994/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0589728 | Date: | 30.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0589728 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B64C21/00 | [1994/13] | CPC: |
B64C21/00 (EP,US);
Y02T50/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1994/13] | Title | German: | Steueranlagen der Grenzschicht | [1994/13] | English: | Boundary layer control systems | [1994/13] | French: | Systèmes de contrôle de la couche limite | [1994/13] | Examination procedure | 06.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/27] | 10.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 27.12.1995 | FR | 27.12.1995 | IT | 27.12.1995 | SE | 27.03.1996 | DE | 28.03.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/26] | ES | 27.12.1995 | |
IT | 27.12.1995 | ||
SE | 27.03.1996 | ||
DE | 28.03.1996 | ||
FR | 24.05.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 27.12.1995 | |
SE | 27.03.1996 | ||
DE | 28.03.1996 | ||
FR | 24.05.1996 | ||
Former [1996/44] | SE | 27.03.1996 | |
DE | 28.03.1996 | ||
FR | 24.05.1996 | ||
Former [1996/42] | SE | 27.03.1996 | |
FR | 24.05.1996 | ||
Former [1996/32] | SE | 27.03.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2943828 (DRIEST EDWARD R VAN) [A] 1,3 * column 1, line 30 - line 57 ** column 1, line 72 - column 2, line 8; figures 1,8,13; claim 1 *; | [AD]US4932610 (MAESTRELLO LUCIO [US]) [AD] 1 * column 2, line 17 - line 50 * * column 3, line 17 - line 24 * * column 3, line 38 - line 48 * | [A] - LIEPMANN ET AL., "CONTROL OF LAMINAR-INSTABILITY WAVES USING A NEW TECHNIQUE", JOURNAL OF FLUID MECHANICS, GREAT BRITAIN, (1982), vol. 118, pages 187 - 200 [A] 1 * page 188, line 4 - line 13 * |