EP0599457 - Ophthalmic lens with reduced edge glare [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.2000 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2000 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 21.06.2000 [2000/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IOLAB CORPORATION 500 Iolab Drive Claremont California 91711-4881 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/22] | For all designated states IOLAB CORPORATION 500 Iolab Drive Claremont, California 91711-4881 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Woffinden, George Joseph 1445 Covina Hills Road Covina, California 91724 / US | 02 /
Fledderjohann, Michael Lee 7531 Braceo Street Phelan, California 92371 / US | [1994/22] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/22] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 93307646.5 | 27.09.1993 | [1994/22] | Priority number, date | US19920952388 | 28.09.1992 Original published format: US 952388 | [1994/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0599457 | Date: | 01.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0599457 | Date: | 19.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/16, G02C7/16 | [1994/22] | CPC: |
G02C7/02 (EP,US);
A61F2/145 (EP,US);
A61F2/16 (EP,US);
A61F2/1613 (EP,US);
G02C7/04 (EP,US);
A61F2002/1696 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, PT, SE [1994/22] | Title | German: | Künstliche Augenlinse mit verminderter Randblendung | [1998/34] | English: | Ophthalmic lens with reduced edge glare | [1994/22] | French: | Lentille ophtalmique avec réduction de l'éblouissement marginal | [1994/22] |
Former [1994/22] | Ophthalmische Linse mit verminderter Randverblendung | Examination procedure | 04.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/01] | 29.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.11.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.05.1999 | PT | 19.08.1999 | [2000/25] |
Former [2000/24] | AT | 19.05.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]SU1537244 ; | [YA]US4449257 (KOENIGER ERICH A [US]) [Y] 3,4 * figure - * [A] 1,2,5-9; | [DA]US4596578 (KELMAN CHARLES D [US]) [DA] 1,2,5-10 * column 4, line 24 - line 45; figure 6 * * column 5, line 7 - line 20 *; | [X]GB2181355 (STORZ INSTR CO) [X] 1,7-10 * page 2, line 20 - line 23 * * page 2, line 74 - line 112; figures 3,10 *; | [A]EP0276331 (MEUR GUY); | [DYA]US4781717 (GRENDAHL DENNIS T [US]) [DY] 11 * column 2, line 1 - line 5; figure - * [A] 1; | [A]US4808181 (KELMAN CHARLES D [US]); | [X]EP0329981 (ADVANCE MEDICAL S R L [IT]) [X] 1,7-9 * column 3, line 30 - line 39; figure 3 *; | [A]WO9214421 (GRENDAHL DENNIS T [US]) [A] 1,7-10 * abstract * * page 12, line 6 - page 13, line 3 *; | [PX]US5171320 (NISHI OKIHIRO [JP]) [PX] 1,2,5,7-10* column 8, line 16 - line 18; figures 1,7-9 * | [XY] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, (19900919), vol. 90, no. 32, Database accession no. 90-244636, & SU1537244 A 00000000 (EYE DISEASE RES. INS.) [X] 1,2,5,7-9 * abstract * [Y] 3,4,11 |