EP0594384 - System and method for controlling a nuclear reactor upon steam flow control valve failure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.07.1995 [1995/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/17] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tang, Calvin Kwan 1321 Sidney Drive Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US | 02 /
Marquino, Wayne 1360 Lindsay Way San Jose, California 95118-1429 / US | [1994/17] | Representative(s) | Lupton, Frederick, et al LONDON PATENT OPERATION G.E. TECHNICAL SERVICES Co. INC. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/17] | Lupton, Frederick, et al LONDON PATENT OPERATION, G.E. TECHNICAL SERVICES Co. INC., Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 93308269.5 | 18.10.1993 | [1994/17] | Priority number, date | US19920963187 | 19.10.1992 Original published format: US 963187 | [1994/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0594384 | Date: | 27.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G21D3/06, F01D21/20 | [1994/17] | CPC: |
G21D3/06 (EP,US);
F01K3/181 (EP,US);
F01K9/04 (EP,US);
Y02E30/00 (EP);
Y02E30/30 (US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/17] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Steuerung eines Kernreaktors im Falle eines Dampfflusssteuerventilausfalls | [1994/17] | English: | System and method for controlling a nuclear reactor upon steam flow control valve failure | [1994/17] | French: | Système et procédé de commande d'un réacteur nuclaire en cas de défaillance d'une vanne réglante de débit de vapeur | [1994/17] | File destroyed: | 07.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 28.10.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/30] | 24.02.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1995/30] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPS6158903 ; | [XA]JPH04214907 ; | [XA]JPH04179803 ; | [XA]JPH039003 ; | [XA]JPS6232393 ; | [A]US3931503 (BERKEBILE GARY W, et al) [A] 1-10 * column A; figure 1 *; | [A]US4472345 (TANJI JUNICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10* column A; figure 4 * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860802), vol. 10, no. 222, Database accession no. (M - 504)<2278>, & JP61058903 A 19860326 (HITACHI) [X] 1,9 * abstract * [A] 2,3 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921203), vol. 16, no. 561, Database accession no. (M - 1341), & JP04214907 A 19920805 (TOSHIBA) [X] 1,9 * abstract * [A] 2,3 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921009), vol. 16, no. 487, Database accession no. (M - 1323), & JP04179803 A 19920626 (TOSHIBA) [X] 1,9 * abstract * [A] 2-4 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910320), vol. 15, no. 117, Database accession no. (M - 1095), & JP03009003 A 19910110 (TOSHIBA) [X] 1,9 * abstract * [A] 2,3 | [XA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 87, no. 12, Database accession no. 87-082436, & JPS6232393 A 19870212 (HITACHI) [X] 1,9 * abstract * [A] 2,3,5 |