EP0594427 - A printed circuit board mounted with electric elements thereon [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.01.2001 [2001/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/05] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1994/17] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawaguchi, Joji, c/o NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1994/17] | Representative(s) | Moir, Michael Christopher, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/17] | Moir, Michael Christopher, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 93308379.2 | 21.10.1993 | [1994/17] | Priority number, date | JP19920282638 | 21.10.1992 Original published format: JP 28263892 | [1994/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0594427 | Date: | 27.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0594427 | Date: | 21.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0594427 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/18, H05K1/09 | [1994/17] | CPC: |
H05K1/181 (EP,US);
H05K3/244 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H01L2924/19105 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10681 (EP,US);
H05K3/361 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1994/17] | Title | German: | Leiterplatte mit darauf montierten elektrischen Bauelementen | [1994/17] | English: | A printed circuit board mounted with electric elements thereon | [1994/17] | French: | Plaque à circuit imprimé avec des éléments électriques montés dessus | [1994/17] | Examination procedure | 22.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/29] | 14.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0402811 (HEWLETT PACKARD GMBH [DE]) [Y] 2 * column 4, line 45 - column 5, line 11 * * column 10, line 13 - line 43 *; | [Y]JPS5990938 ; | [X]JPH0451582 ; | [X]JPH04116837 ; | [A]EP0081135 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-3 * claim - * | [XY] - D. PERRY, "Multiple technologies shrink future PCB modules", PRINTED CIRCUIT DESIGN, (199102), vol. 8, no. 2, pages 36 - 41, XP000962643 [X] 1,3 * the whole document * [Y] 2 | [Y] - M. KOHARA ET AL., "New developments of thin plastic package with high terminal counts", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMPONENTS,HYBRIDS,AND MANUFACTURING TECHNOLOGY, NEW YORK US, (199006), vol. 13, no. 2, pages 401 - 406, XP000179253 [Y] 2 * page 405, column L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/33.56175 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840920), vol. 008, no. 206, Database accession no. (E - 267), & JP59090938 A 19840525 (NIPPON DENKI KK) [Y] 2 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920605), vol. 16, no. 246, Database accession no. (E - 1212), & JP04051582 A 19920220 (NEC CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920807), vol. 16, no. 367, Database accession no. (E - 1245), & JP04116837 A 19920417 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO) [X] 1 * abstract * | [XA] - C. RICE, "Reliable bonding of high-lead-count SMDs", SURFACE MOUNT TECHNOLOGY, (199202), vol. 6, no. 2, pages 41 - 42, XP000654227 [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2 | [X] - M. BAKER ET AL., "A mixed technology goes three ways", SURFACE MOUNT TECHNOLOGY, (199109), vol. 5, no. 9, pages 26 - 29, XP000962644 [X] 1 * the whole document * | [X] - PH. CLOT, "Chip on board (COB) multichip modules design pssibilities and manufacturing", 11TH IEEE/CHMT INTERNATIONAL ELECTRONICS MANUFACTURING TECHNOLOGY SYMPOSIUM, 16-18 SEPTEMBER 1991, SAN FRANCISCO US, (1991), pages 346 - 347, XP000244945 [X] 1 * the whole document * |